Moormann, et al v. Schriro, et al

Case Number: 2:1991cv01121
Filed: July 11, 1991
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
Presiding Judge: Roslyn O Silver
Nature of Suit: Death Penalty - Habeas Corpus
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Ptn for Writ of H/C - Stay of Execution
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 30, 2012 259 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Petitioner's 257 Motion to Seal; the Clerk shall file Petitioner's lodged Motion for Resources for Warrant Litigation (Doc. 258) ex parte and under seal. Signed by Chief Judge Roslyn O Silver on 3/30/12.(REW)
February 27, 2012 250 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Petitioner's 248 Motion for Relief from Judgment Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 60(b)(6) and Motion for Stay of Execution is DENIED. Signed by Chief Judge Roslyn O Silver on 2/27/12.(MAP)
January 26, 2012 246 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 242 Motion to Seal. Signed by Chief Judge Roslyn O Silver on 1/26/12.(LAD)
January 6, 2012 236 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 234 Motion to Seal. The Clerk of Court shall file Petitioner's lodged Motion for Attorney Hours and Resources (Doc. 235 ) ex parte and under seal. Signed by Chief Judge Roslyn O Silver on 1/5/12.(MAP)
November 18, 2008 213 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 208 Motion to Alter or Amend Judgment. Signed by Judge Roslyn O Silver on 11/18/08.(DMT, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moormann, et al v. Schriro, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?