Apelt, et al v. Ryan, et al

Defendant: Dora B Schriro and Charles L Ryan
Petitioner: Rudi Alfred Apelt
Respondent: Attorney General of the State of Arizona, Megan Savage and Dora B Schriro
Amicus: National Association
Case Number: 2:1997cv01249
Filed: June 12, 1997
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Pinal
Presiding Judge: Roslyn O Silver
Nature of Suit: Death Penalty
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 20, 2012 228 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 220 Petitioner's Motion to Construe Petitioner's Request for Certificate of Appealability. The Clerk of Court shall treat Petitioner's Certificate of Appealability, filed June 29, 2011, as a Notice of Appeal and shall process said Notice of Appeal forthwith. Signed by Chief Judge Roslyn O Silver on 4/20/12.(DMT)
September 13, 2011 218 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER lifting the stay of Petitioner's sentencing claims (Doc. 147), dismissing Petitioner's sentencing-related claims as moot, and denying with prejudice Petitioner's amended petition for habeas corpus relief (Doc. 39). The Clerk s hall enter judgment accordingly. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED granting 217 Petitioner's Motion for Certificate of Appealability on the following issue: Whether Claim 4, alleging that Petitioner's right to effective assistance of counsel under the Sixth and Fourteenth Amendments was violated by trial counsel failing to investigate the opinions his expert witness, Dr. Vincent DeMaio, before calling him to testify, fails on the merits. Signed by Chief Judge Roslyn O Silver on 9/13/11. (LSP)
May 23, 2011 214 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - that no later than fifteen (15) days after the filing date of this Order, Petitioner shall show cause in writing why the stay of his sentencing claims should not be lifted, the claims dismissed as moot, and judgment entered. Unl ess otherwise directed by the Court, Respondents shall not file a response. The Clerk of Court shall update the title of this case to reflect the substitution of Charles L. Ryan as the Director of the Arizona Department of Corrections. Signed by Chief Judge Roslyn O Silver on 5/20/11. (DMT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Apelt, et al v. Ryan, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Rudi Alfred Apelt
Represented By: Dale A Baich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Attorney General of the State of Arizona
Represented By: Kent E Cattani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Megan Savage
Represented By: Kent E Cattani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Dora B Schriro
Represented By: Kent E Cattani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: National Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dora B Schriro
Represented By: Kent E Cattani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles L Ryan
Represented By: Kent E Cattani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?