Styers, et al v. Stewart, et al

Case Number: 2:1998cv02244
Filed: December 16, 1998
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Death Penalty - Habeas Corpus Office
Presiding Judge: Earl H Carroll
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:2254 Ptn for Writ of H/C - Stay of Execution

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 20, 2013 185 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM JUDGMENT re 171 . ORDER that, in the event Petitioner files an appeal, a certificate of appealability is denied. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 3/20/13.(TLJ)
December 4, 2012 182 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the Court directs Respondents to file in this Court copies of the following documents within 30 days of the filing of this order (please see attached order for complete information). Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 12/4/12. (TLJ)
September 11, 2012 177 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER on CERTIFICATE OF APPEALABILITY - that Petitioner's 175 Motion for Certificate of Appealability is GRANTED IN PART. The Court finds that reasonable jurists could debate whether, in correcting the constitutional error in his sentence, the state court was obligated to provide Petitioner with a new sentencing proceeding before a jury re 173 Notice of Appeal. Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 9/10/12. (DMT)
August 24, 2012 174 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 172 Petitioner Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Respondents shall file a response to Petitioner's (Doc. 171) Motion for Relief from Judgment no later than September 14, 2012. Because this Court has returned the state c ourt record to the Arizona Supreme Court (see Doc. 154), Respondents shall append to their response copies of any documents or transcripts from the state court record relevant to consideration of Petitioner's motion. Petitioner may file a reply no later than September 24, 2012. Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 8/24/12.(DMT)
July 26, 2012 170 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING MOTION TO ENTER JUDGMENT 160 . Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 7/26/12.(TLJ)
February 9, 2012 165 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice 164 Respondents' Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 2/9/12.(DMT)
January 27, 2012 162 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 158 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Julie S. Hall is substituted for Cary Sandman as lead counsel in this matter, effective January 17, 2012. Granting 159 Petitioner's Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 1/27/12.(DMT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Styers, et al v. Stewart, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?