Gametech Intl v. Trend Gaming Systems
Case Number: 2:2001cv00540
Filed: March 22, 2001
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Office: Phoenix Division Office
Presiding Judge: Lawrence O Anderson
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 12, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 643 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. ORDERED that the Clerk shall reassign this case to a Magistrate Judge (hereby granting 636 ). FURTHER ORDERED that the motion for a pretrial scheduling conference 635 remains pending. Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 12/12/2008. (This matter is reassigned by lot to Magistrate Judge Edward C. Voss. The case number on future filings shall read as follows: CV-01-540-PHX-ECV).(LAD)
December 1, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 640 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re subject matter jurisdiction. Show Cause Response due by noon 12/5/2008. Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 12/1/2008. (JAT)
October 14, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 633 ORDER accepting and adopting by this Court 615 Magistrate Judge's REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION - that the district court find that magistrate judge jurisdiction conferred in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c) was not "broken" by appeal and that the magistrate judge jurisdiction conferred by the parties' consent, and the Notice of Assignment continues on remand following appeal. Signed by Judge Paul G Rosenblatt on 10/13/08. (LSP)
August 9, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 589 ORDER that the parties' Joint Stipulated Motion to Exonerate Supersedeas Bonds is Granted, and FURTHER ORDERED that GameTech's supersedeas bonds, bond nos.AJ8007 and AK1219, are exonerated effectively immediately Re 551 Notice re Posting Supersedeas Bond 550 and 491. Signed by Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 8/9/07. (KMG)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gametech Intl v. Trend Gaming Systems
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?