Lee, et al v. Schriro, et al

Case Number: 2:2004cv00039
Filed: January 9, 2004
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Death Penalty - Habeas Corpus
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Ptn for Writ of H/C - Stay of Execution
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 7, 2016 132 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Respondent's 129 Motion to Strike Exhibits. Respondents may file a surreply no later than March 25, 2016. Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 03/07/2016. (ATD)
September 30, 2010 93 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OF DECISION AND ORDER; Petitioner's Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus 52 is DENIED WITH PREJUDICE; the Clerk of Court shall enter judgment accordingly; the stay of execution entered on 1/14/04 (Doc. 3) is VACATED; a Certifi cate of Appealability is GRANTED as to the following issues: Claim 9-A: Whether trial counsel's presentation of a "false" alibi defense constituted ineffective assistance of counsel; Claim 9-B: Whether trial counsel's failure to f ully investigate a voluntary intoxication defense constituted ineffective assistance of counsel; Claim 9-D: Whether trial counsel's investigation and presentation of relevant mitigating evidence at sentencing constituted ineffective assistance of counsel; the Clerk of Court shall send a courtesy copy of this Order to Rachelle M. Resnick, Clerk of the Arizona Supreme Court. Signed by Judge Mary H Murguia on 9/30/10. (REW)
August 16, 2010 91 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that counsel for the Respondents, the Arizona Attorney General's Office, submit a Notice of Filing of (1) Petitioner's Supplement to Pre-sentencing Memorandum, filed 2/17/93 (Doc. 96); (2) Letter from Defendant, filed 2/17/93 (Doc. 97 ); (3) Presentence Report, filed 3/1/93 (Doc. 98); (4) Exhibits from the Aggravation Mitigation Hearing held on February 10, 1993, Ex. 1, 2, 4, 5, and 6. The Arizona Supreme Court numbers for this case are: No. CR-93-0111-AP & CR-93-0323-T/AP. The superior court number for this case is: La Paz County Superior Court No. CR-92-01-13. Signed by Judge Mary H Murguia on 8/10/10. (DMT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lee, et al v. Schriro, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?