Sekuk Global Ent, et al v. Apollo Group Inc, et al

Case Number: 2:2004cv02147
Filed: October 12, 2004
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
Presiding Judge: James A Teilborg
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 15:78m(a) Securities Exchange Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 2, 2012 784 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that NASI's 773 Petition for Attorneys' Fees is denied. Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 10/2/2012.(LFIG)
April 20, 2012 770 Opinion or Order of the Court FINAL APPROVAL ORDER AND JUDGMENT granting 739 the Parties' Motion for Final Approval of the Class Action Settlement and Entry of Final Judgment and Order of Dismissal; granting 730 Plaintiff's Stipulation and Agreement regarding Final Approval Order and Judgment; granting 740 Plaintiff's Motion for Attorney Fees; and granting 747 Defendants' Motion to Vacate Judgment. The Clerk shall vacate 695 this Court's Judgment of April 6, 2011. Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 4/20/12.(LSP)
July 17, 2009 678 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Dfts' 669 Motion for Review of Taxation of Costs is denied. It is further ordered that Jonathan Lee Riches, Jalaluddin Haqqani, and Gulbuddin Hekmatyar's 677 Motion to Intervene, Motion for Amicus Curiae Brief, Motion for Reconsideration is denied. Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 07/16/09.(ESL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sekuk Global Ent, et al v. Apollo Group Inc, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?