Patterson v. Schriro, et al

Case Number: 2:2005cv01159
Filed: April 15, 2005
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
Presiding Judge: Paul G Rosenblatt
Referring Judge: Virginia A Mathis
Nature of Suit: Prisoner - Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 31, 2012 157 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, that the reference to the Magistrate Judge is withdrawn as to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc. 145). Defendants' 145 Motion for Summary Judgment is granted in part and denied in part as follows: (a) the motion is gran ted as to summary judgment in favor of Defendants on the remaining First Amendment claim; (b) the motion is denied as to attorney's fees under 42 U.S.C. § 1988. The Clerk of Court must enter judgment accordingly and terminate the action. For the reasons set forth herein, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3), an appeal from the judgment in this action would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Senior Judge Robert C Broomfield on 5/30/12.(DMT)
April 17, 2012 154 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice the 144 Motion for Order to Show Cause. Signed by Senior Judge Robert C Broomfield on 4/17/12.(DMT)
February 27, 2012 142 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 136 Motion to Continue or Reinstate Stay. The previously ordered time frame in which the parties have to file any dispositive motions is sua sponte extended. Such motions, by any party, shall be filed no later than March 13, 2012. Signed by Judge Robert C Broomfield on 2/27/12.(DMT)
February 2, 2012 138 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 136 MOTION to continue or reinstate Stay : The expiration on January 30, 2012, by its own terms, of this court's 30 day stay renders moot plaintiff's motion to the extent he is seeking a continuance of such stay. There is s till the outstanding issue, however, of whether the court should, as plaintiff seeks, reinstate that stay. In any event, because the original 30 day stay has been lifted, to that extent plaintiff's pending motion seeks to reinstate that stay, such motion is properly before this court. Before ruling on that motion, however, the court will await defendants' response, if any. In the interim, any dispositive motions which the parties desire to file shall be filed no later than thirty (30) days from the date of entry of this order. Signed by Judge Robert C Broomfield on 2/2/12. (DMT)
December 29, 2011 133 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 131 Motion for Delay/Stay: The Court grants plaintiff a stay, but only, as defendants agree, for 30 days from the date of entry of this order and grants plaintiff the right to file a motion, prior to the expirationo of the initial 30- day stay, for an additional stay not to exceed 30 days upon a showing that his physical and emotional condition has not improved sufficiently for him to participate meaningfully in these proceedings. Signed by Judge Robert C Broomfield on 12/29/11.(DMT)
October 26, 2011 130 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 128 Motion for Clarification and if Needed Noticeof Appeal: GRANTING to the extent he is seeking clarification, but DENIED as moot insofar as he is seeking leave to file a Notice of Appeal. Signed by Judge Robert C Broomfield on 10/25/11.(DMT)
August 26, 2011 127 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER withdrawing the reference to the Magistrate Judge as to (Doc. 115). Granting 115 Defendants' Amended Motion to Dismiss RLUIPA and Injunction Claims with prejudice. Signed by Judge Robert C Broomfield on 8/26/11.(DMT) *Modified on 8/26/2011 to add text* (DMT).
December 2, 2010 123 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 121 Plaintiff's Motion to Strike ; denying 122 Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Robert C Broomfield on 12/1/10.(DMT)
October 13, 2010 113 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the reference to the Magistrate Judge is withdrawn as to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 90) and Plaintiff's Motion for Deferment (Doc. 95). Denying as moot 90 Motion to Dismiss Counts/Claims; denying as moot 95 Motion for Deferment. Signed by Judge Robert C Broomfield on 10/13/10.(DMT)
September 2, 2010 105 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the reference to the Magistrate Judge is withdrawn as to Plaintiff's Motion Requesting Order and denying 87 Motion for injunctive relief. Signed by Judge Robert C Broomfield on 8/31/10.(DMT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Patterson v. Schriro, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?