Equal Employment Opportunity Commission v. Creative Networks, LLC et al

Case Number: 2:2005cv03032
Filed: September 30, 2005
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
Presiding Judge: Stephen M McNamee
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 15, 2010 169 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Defendant Creative Networks, LLC's 132 Motion for Summary Judgment. A final pretrial conference is set for March 3, 2010 at 2:00 p.m. (See order details). Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 1/15/2010.(TCA, )
December 9, 2009 164 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 152 Motion to Strike and denying motion for leave to file surreply. Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 12/8/2009.(LAD)
November 17, 2009 157 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Discovery Hearing set for 12/2/2009 01:30 PM in Courtroom 605, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Stephen M McNamee. Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 11/17/2009. FURTHER ORDERED that no later than Monday, November 3 0, 2009, Plaintiff shall submit to the Court any proof showing that the documents in Exhibit D were requested by Plaintiff pursuant to the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and what response, if any, was given by Defendant to such a document request. Defendants shall also submit a short brief of no more than 3 pages addressing Plaintiffs claims of non-disclosure by Monday, November 30, 2009.(TCA, )
June 19, 2009 146 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 145 Stipulation to Extend Time; deadline for Defendant to file a Reply in support of its Motion for Summary Judgment is extended to July 20, 2009. Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 6/19/09. (LSP)
March 19, 2009 131 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OF DECISION AND ORDER granting 93 Defendant Res-Care, Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment; Res-Care is dismissed from the present case. Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 3/19/09.(LSP)
March 9, 2009 130 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OF DECISION AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED DENYING Defendants Creative Networks, LLC and Res-Care, Inc.'s 97 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. FURTHER ORDERED that the parties may file a motion for summary jgm regarding the issues of legitimate nondiscriminatory reasons and pretext for Allen's retaliation claim by 4/10/09, if they so desire. Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 3/9/09.(SAT)
December 15, 2008 127 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 121 Plaintiff's Motion to Strike. IT IS FURTHER ORDEREED striking Response to Plaintiff's EEOC's Statement of Facts 118 , as well as Reply to EEOC's Local Rule 56.1(b) Response to Defe ndant's Statement of Facts and exhibits 116 without prejudice with leave to refile in accordance with the Federal and Local Rules of Civil Procedure. The amended Reply shall be filed no later than 1/9/09. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant C reative Networks, LLC's Exhibits to its Reply in Support of its Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (Docs. 115-2, Exhibits A-F) are not stricken. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED denying 121 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File a Surreply. Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 12/12/08.(LSP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Equal Employment Opportunity Commission v. Creative Networks, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?