Vickey Sarantis v. ADP, Inc. et al

Case Number: 2:2006cv02153
Filed: September 7, 2006
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
Presiding Judge: David G Campbell
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 10, 2008 161 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 158 Motion to Amend/Correct Final Pretrial Order nunc pro tunc to 11/12/08 by adding the following: 1. to section G thereof, consistent with the Court's Order on 09/15/08, docket #151, a. Plaintiff's designations of trial w itness Tom Reap's deposition: 18:8-19:18; 20:16-23 (Defendant's hearsay objection: sustained by the Court); 22:3-24; 23:12-14; 25:7-28:8; 29:12-19; 30:10-31:24 (Defendant's objections to 31:16-24 based on speculation: overruled by the Court), b. Defendant's Designations: 5:25-18:5. 2. to section A thereof, Robin Harrison, Esq. as co-counsel for Defendant, consistent with the order granting his admission on 06/11/08. (docket #135). Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 12/09/08.(DNH) Modified on 12/11/2008 (TLJ). DOCKET MODIFIED TO REFLECT NUNC PRO TUNC DATE OF 11/12/08 INSTEAD OF 12/12/08.
November 25, 2008 159 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. Before the Court rules on Defendant's 158 MOTION/REQUEST for Amendment to Final Pretrial Order, Defenant shall lodge by 12/3/08 its proposed order; Plaintiff shall file her response within 7 days of Defendant's lodging the proposed order (see order for full details). Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 11/24/08. (REW, )
October 31, 2008 154 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - that the parties shall show cause in writing why this Court should not order that each side is limited to 22.5 hours to try this case. The parties shall file their responses to this OSC on or before Monday, November 10, 2008 and optional replies to the adverse party's response by Friday, November 21, 2008. The Final Pretrial Order will not be filed until this issue is resolved. Absent a showing of good cause, failure to timely filea response shall be deemed that party's consent to 22.5 hours to try this case. Show Cause Response due by 11/10/2008. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 10/31/08. (KMG, )
September 15, 2008 153 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Defendant's 152 Motion to Continue Trial. Trial reset for 1/6/2009 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson; all other orders set forth in the Court's 6/23/08 order are affirmed (see order for full details). Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 9/15/08.(REW, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vickey Sarantis v. ADP, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?