Gates v. Schriro

Case Number: 2:2006cv02251
Filed: September 19, 2006
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
Presiding Judge: Paul G Rosenblatt
Referring Judge: Edward C Voss
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 20, 2011 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 29 Petitioner's Motion to Reopen Case. ORDER that no certificate of appealability shall be issued. Signed by Judge Paul G Rosenblatt on 12/20/11.(TLJ)
March 24, 2009 23 Opinion or Order of the Court Certificate of Appealability Denied. Probable cause does not exist for the appeal. Applicant has not made a substantial showing of the denial of a constitutional right; in forma pauperis status denied as to this appeal re 18 Notice of Appeal. ORDERED that the petitioner's 19 MOTION (Application) for Certificate of Appealability is denied. Signed by Judge Paul G Rosenblatt on 3/24/2009. (See document for full details). (LAD)
February 2, 2009 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation 13 is accepted and adopted by the Court. FURTHER ORDERED that the petitioner's Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by a Person in State Custody, filed pursuant to 29 U.S.C. § 2254, is denied as time-barred and that this action is dismissed. The Clerk of the Court shall enter judgment accordingly. Signed by Judge Paul G Rosenblatt on 2/2/09. (KMG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gates v. Schriro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.

Why Is My Information Online?