Kinnally et al v. Rogers Corporation

Case Number: 2:2006cv02704
Filed: November 9, 2006
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
Presiding Judge: James A Teilborg
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 29:621 Job Discrimination (Age)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 9, 2009 139 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS ORDERED GRANTING Dft's 93 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 3/9/09.(SAT)
December 12, 2008 134 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot plas' 119 Motion for Leave to File; granting plas' 120 Motion to Strike re 117 Reply in Support of Motion and granting 121 Motion to Strike re 118 Objection. Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 12/12/2008.(LAD)
December 10, 2008 133 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice 131 dft's motion to exclude reports and testimony of plas' expert Staci Schonbrun and denying as moot the parties' 132 Stipulation. Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 12/9/2008. (LAD)
November 7, 2008 128 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Plas' Motion 92 for Adverse Inference Due to Spoliation of Evidence is DENIED. Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 11/7/08.(KMG, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kinnally et al v. Rogers Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?