Baker v. D.A.R.A. II, Inc. et al

Case Number: 2:2006cv02887
Filed: November 30, 2006
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
Presiding Judge: Susan R Bolton
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 15:2(a) Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 29, 2008 103 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER pursuant to 102 Stipulation to Dismiss with Prejudice; Plaintiff, Dixie Baker, be and hereby is awarded a final judgment against Defendant, Kenneth Presutti, in the amount of $180,000.00; Plaintiff's remaining claims against all other Defendants are dismissed with prejudice; the parties hereby shall bear their own costs and attorneys' fees. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 10/29/08. (REW, )
October 27, 2008 101 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 99 Joint Motion to Approve Settlement. FURTHER ORDERED that on or before 10/31/08, the parties shall filed their Stipulated Judgment in favor of Plaintiff Dixie Baker against Defendant Kenneth Presutti and a Stipulation for Dismissal with prejudice against all other Defendants. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 10/27/08.(MAP)
September 24, 2008 91 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Plaintiffs Request to Treat Her September 17, 2008 89 Status Report as a Response to Defendants September 16, 2008 Motion to EnforceSettlement Agreement is GRANTED. Plaintiffs Status Report, 89 , is hereby deemed Plaintiffs Response to D efendants September 16, 2008 87 Motion to Enforce Settlement Agreement. Defendants shall file a Reply, which shall include the supplemental briefing discussed herein, on or before Wednesday, October 1, 2008. Evidentiary Hearing set for 10/3/2008 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson. (see order for details). Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 9/24/08. (DMT, )
September 17, 2008 88 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ; Plaintiff shall file a Response to Defendants' 87 STATUS REPORT (deemed a motion to enforce settlement agreement) by 9/29/08; ddefendants shall file a reply by 10/8/08. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 9/17/08. (REW, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baker v. D.A.R.A. II, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?