Gandy v. Shaklan-Brown et al

Case Number: 2:2006cv03072
Filed: December 22, 2006
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
Presiding Judge: Paul G Rosenblatt
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 9, 2010 127 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice 118 Motion for Summary Judgment Re: Counterclaim filed by Defendant/Crossclaimant Lynne T. Shaklan-Brown, Ph.D. Signed by Judge Paul G Rosenblatt on 3/8/10.(LSP)
June 24, 2009 123 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - Currently before the Court is the parties' 121 Stipulated Motion to Stay the Proceedings and Refer the Matter to Magistrate Judge Mark A. Aspey or Another Settlement Judge for a Second Settlement Conference. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that t his matter is referred to Magistrate Judge Mark A. Aspey for a second settlement conference. FURTHER ORDERED that if settlement is successful, the parties shall file a Notice of Settlement within five (5) calendar days of the settlement conference. F URTHER ORDERED that if the settlement conference is not successful, Dr. Gandy shall file his Response to the pending Motion for Summary Jgm within two calendar weeks after the conclusion of the settlement conference. There shall be no further discovery with respect to the pending Motion for Summary Jgm. Signed by Judge Paul G Rosenblatt on 6/23/09. (SAT)
May 7, 2009 114 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Plaintiff's 112 Motion to Amend the Court's Order 112 ; Jarrett J Haskovec may appear at the 5/18/09 Status Conference in lieu of attorney Nicholas J Enoch. Signed by Judge Paul G Rosenblatt on 5/7/09.(REW, )
September 30, 2008 101 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Dft Lynn Shaklan-Brown's 49 Motion to Amend Answer, and to Add Counterclaim and Third-Party Complaint is GRANTED to the extent that it seeks permission to file an amended answer with specified affirmative defenses and a counterclaim for conversion, and it is DENIED to the extent that it seeks permission to file a third-party complaint. Dft Lynne Shaklan-Brown shall file her amended answer and counterclaim no later than 10/10/08. Signed by Judge Paul G Rosenblatt on 09/30/08. (ESL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gandy v. Shaklan-Brown et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?