Taser International Inc v. Stinger Systems, Inc.

Plaintiff: Taser International Inc
Defendant: Stinger Systems, Inc.
Counter Claimant: Stinger Systems, Inc.
Counter Defendant: Taser International Inc
Case Number: 2:2007cv00042
Filed: January 5, 2007
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: Mary H Murguia
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 4, 2010 224 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 218 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Mary H Murguia on 6/2/10.(KSP)
March 31, 2010 211 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying in part and granting in part Stinger's Motion 160 for Summary Judgment of Patent Invalidity or Noninfringement. Summary judgment is GRANTED as to claim 3 of the '870 patent, finding it invalid as obvious. Summary judgment is DENIED as to the rest of the grounds for relief set forth in Stinger's motion. Granting TASER's Motion 184 for Partial Summary Judgment of Literal Infringement. Denying as moot Stinger's request 194 for consolidated oral argument. A consolidated oral argument was held on March 23, 2010. FURTHER ORDERED denying TASER's Motion 197 for Leave to File Supplemental Counsel Declaration in Support of TASER's Reply in Support of its Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of L iteral Infringement. FURTHER ORDERED denying TASER's Motion 199 for Leave to File Surreply or in the Alternative to Strike Stinger Systems, Inc.'s Improper and Oversized Reply in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED setting this matter for Status Hearing on April 19, 2010 at 4:30 p.m. Signed by Judge Mary H Murguia on 3/31/10.(KMG)
September 8, 2008 131 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 55 Plaintiff TASER's Motion to Dismiss or Strike Defendant Stinger's inequitable conduct defenses for failure to plead with particularity under Fed.R.Civ.P. 9(b). Signed by Judge Mary H Murguia on 9/5/08.(LSP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Taser International Inc v. Stinger Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stinger Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Ray Kendall Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Taser International Inc
Represented By: Holly L Gibeaut
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Stinger Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Ray Kendall Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Taser International Inc
Represented By: Aaron H Matz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?