Karlsson Group, Inc. et al v. Langley Farm Investments, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Karlsson Group, Inc. and Anders Karlsson
Defendant: Stacy J Brimhall, Largo, LLC, Steven G Rees, Langley Petrified Forest Ranch, LLC, Langley Farm Investments, LLC, Parshelle S Brimhall, Albert Van Wagner, Acres4U Land & Development, LLC, Stan C Strom, Brenda L Strom, Rensko, Inc., Millard Oksner and Langley Land, LLC
ThirdParty Defendant: Petrified Forest Ranch LLC, Robert Goot, Donna Jean Cooper, Lawrence Frazin, Norman Colin Keyt, Meir Westreich, Michael Stone and Richard Keyt
ThirdParty Plaintiff: Rensko, Inc. and Millard Oksner
Counter Claimant: Rensko, Inc. and Millard Oksner
Counter Defendant: Karlsson Group, Inc. and Anders Karlsson
Case Number: 2:2007cv00457
Filed: February 28, 2007
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: Paul G Rosenblatt
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Tort/Non-Motor Vehicle
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 23, 2011 204 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that Van Wagner Dfts' Motion for Summary Jgm (Doc. 149 ) is granted and that Claim No. 1 of the First Amended Complaint for Damages and Equitable Relief (Interference with Contracts and/or Business Opportunities) is dismi ssed as to dfts Albert E. Van Wagner and Albert E. Van Wagner, Jr., PC. FURTHER ORDERED that the plas' Motion to Compel Discovery and for Payment of Fees and Expenses (Doc. 163 ) is denied. FURTHER ORDERED that the Langley Farm Investments, LL C related dfts' Motion for Summary Jgm (Doc. 166 ) is granted and that Claim No. 1 of the First Amended Complaint for Damages and Equitable Relief (Interference with Contracts and/or Business Opportunities) is dismissed as to dfts Langley Farm Investments, LLC, Langley Petrified Forest Ranch, LLC, Langley Land, LLC, Largo Ventures, LLC, Steven G. Rees, Stacy J. Brimhall, and Parshelle S. Brimhall. FURTHER ORDERED that the plas' Motion for Summary Jgm or, in the Alternative Summary Ad judication of Issues (Doc. 168 ) is denied. FURTHER ORDERED that the plas' Motion for Joint Oral Argument in Summary Jgm Motions (Doc. 175 ) is denied. FURTHER ORDERED that Van Wagner Dfts' Motion for Rule 11 Sanctions (Doc. 177 ) is den ied. FURTHER ORDERED that the plas' Motion to Stay Proceedings re Van Wagner Motion for Sanctions, or to Enlarge Time for Filing Opposition (Doc. 201 ) is denied as moot. FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall enter jgm in favor of r emaining dfts Langley Farm Investments, LLC, Langley Petrified Forest Ranch, LLC, Langley Land, LLC, Largo Ventures, LLC, Steven G. Rees, Stacy J. Brimhall, Parshelle S. Brimhall, Albert E. Van Wagner and Albert E. Van Wagner, Jr., PC.. Signed by Judge Paul G Rosenblatt on 2/22/11. (SAT)
September 1, 2009 128 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 116 Motion to Disqualify Counsel; denying 124 Motion Staying Disqualification Motion; FURTHER ORDERED that plas' Motion for Limited Case Management Order Setting Law and Motion Schedule (part of doc #124) is granted to the exte nt that the parties' shall file an amended joint case management report no later than 10/16/09. FURTHER ORDERED that a scheduling conference shall be held on Tuesday, 11/3/09 at 11:30 a.m. in Courtroom 601 of the Sandra Day O'Connor United States Courthouse, 401 West Washington St, Phoenix, AZ. Signed by Judge Paul G Rosenblatt on 8/31/2009. (LAD)
September 22, 2008 109 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 108 Motion to Dismiss Party: All of the claims in the First Amended Complaint of Plaintiffs Karlsson Group, Inc. and Anders Karlsson against Defendants Rensko, Inc. and Millard Mickey Oksner are dismissed with prejudice; All of the c ounterclaims of Counterclaimants Rensko, Inc. and Millard Mickey Oksner against Counter-defendants Karlsson Group, Inc. and Anders Karlsson are dismissed with prejudice; All of the third party claims of formerly Third Party Plaintiffs Rensko, Inc. an d Millard Mickey Oksner against Third Party Defendants Petrified Forest Ranch, LLC, Donna Cooper, Robert Goot, Lawrence Frazin, Norman Colin Keyt, Michael Stone and Meir J. Westreich, which were all previously dismissed without prejudice, are all now dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Paul G Rosenblatt on 9/19/08.(DMT, )
September 8, 2008 106 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot 53 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; denying as moot 58 Motion to Stay; denying 61 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying as moot 62 Motion for Extension of Time; denying as moot 71 Motion for Extension of Time; de nying as moot 74 Motion for Extension of Time; denying 81 Motion to Strike ; granting in part and denying in part 92 Motion to Dismiss Case. It is granted as to Claim No. 2, Claim No 3, Claim No. 4, and that portion of Claim No. 9 related to the filing of the notice of lis pendens; it is denied as to Claim No. 1 (and that portion of Claim No. 9 related to the real estate commission issue. Signed by Judge Paul G Rosenblatt on 09/08/08.(DNH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Karlsson Group, Inc. et al v. Langley Farm Investments, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stacy J Brimhall
Represented By: Albert E Van Wagner, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Largo, LLC
Represented By: Albert E Van Wagner, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven G Rees
Represented By: Albert E Van Wagner, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Langley Petrified Forest Ranch, LLC
Represented By: Albert E Van Wagner, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Langley Farm Investments, LLC
Represented By: Albert E Van Wagner, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Parshelle S Brimhall
Represented By: Albert E Van Wagner, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Albert Van Wagner
Represented By: Albert E Van Wagner, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acres4U Land & Development, LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey R Simmons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stan C Strom
Represented By: Jeffrey R Simmons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brenda L Strom
Represented By: Jeffrey R Simmons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rensko, Inc.
Represented By: Lisa A Shannon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Millard Oksner
Represented By: Lisa A Shannon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Langley Land, LLC
Represented By: Albert E Van Wagner, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karlsson Group, Inc.
Represented By: Meir J Westreich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anders Karlsson
Represented By: Meir J Westreich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty defendant: Petrified Forest Ranch LLC
Represented By: Norman Colin Keyt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty defendant: Robert Goot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty defendant: Donna Jean Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty defendant: Lawrence Frazin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty defendant: Norman Colin Keyt
Represented By: Norman Colin Keyt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty defendant: Meir Westreich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty defendant: Michael Stone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty defendant: Richard Keyt
Represented By: Victoria Lea Orze
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty plaintiff: Rensko, Inc.
Represented By: Lisa A Shannon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty plaintiff: Millard Oksner
Represented By: Lisa A Shannon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Rensko, Inc.
Represented By: Lisa A Shannon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Millard Oksner
Represented By: Lisa A Shannon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Karlsson Group, Inc.
Represented By: Meir J Westreich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Anders Karlsson
Represented By: Meir J Westreich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?