United States v. Five Firearms and Numerous Firearm Parts and Ammunition

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Five Firearms and Numerous Firearm Parts and Ammunition
Claimant: Frost Armament LLC and Timothy Johnson
Case Number: 2:2007cv00516
Filed: March 8, 2007
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: Stephen M McNamee
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1341 Complaint for Forfeiture
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 21, 2009 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the Motion to Stay (Doc. 32) is GRANTED fora period of 90 days from the date of entry of this Order. Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 12/21/2009.(TCA, ) ENTRY MODIFIED TO REFLECT WO ON 12/22/2009 (MHU).
March 25, 2009 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 27 Motion to Stay for a period of 180 days from the date of entry of this order. Stay Deadline set for 9/21/2009. Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 3/25/09.(REW, )
October 3, 2008 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the 25 Motion to Stay is granted for a period of 180 days from the date of entry of this order. Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 10/03/08.(ESL, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States v. Five Firearms and Numerous Firearm Parts and Ammunition
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Frost Armament LLC
Represented By: Thomas M Hoidal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Timothy Johnson
Represented By: Thomas M Hoidal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Lisa J Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Five Firearms and Numerous Firearm Parts and Ammunition
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?