Stone v. DeRosa et al

Plaintiff: Sydney Stone
Defendant: C J DeRosa, Harley Lappin and Harell Watts
Case Number: 2:2007cv00680
Filed: March 30, 2007
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: John W Sedwick
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 28, 2009 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Pla's 48 Motion to Amend. Watts, Lappin and DeRosa are no longer Defendants in this case in any capacity. It is further ordered that the Clerk of Court shall close this case. Signed by Judge Paul G Rosenblatt on 10/28/09.(ESL)
August 6, 2009 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 46 Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Paul G Rosenblatt on 8/5/09.(LSP)
March 25, 2009 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 25 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment; Rejecting 42 Report and Recommendations. Signed by Judge Paul G Rosenblatt on 3/25/09.(DMT, )
February 18, 2009 42 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 25 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Behalf of Defendants Lappin and Watts (Individual Capacity Claims) : Recommend deny motion; written objections due w/in 10 days, using 07cv680-PHX-PGR. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles R Pyle on 2/18/09. (KMF, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stone v. DeRosa et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sydney Stone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C J DeRosa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harley Lappin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harell Watts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?