Garcia v. Qwest Communications

Plaintiff: Angel Alberto Garcia
Defendant: Qwest Communications
Case Number: 2:2007cv00999
Filed: May 17, 2007
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: Lawrence O Anderson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights (Employment Discrimination)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 4, 2008 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Dft Qwest's Motion for Summary Judgment, docket # 40 , is GRANTED. The Clerk is hereby directed to enter Judgment in favor of Qwest and terminate this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 12/3/08.(KMG, )
October 3, 2008 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Dft Qwest's Rule 26(a)(3), FED.R.CIV.P., Objections, docket # 39 , deemed a motion to preclude Pla from calling witnesses and using exhibits in response to Qwest's Motion for Summary Judgment or at trial is GRANTED. Except for t rue impeachment witnesses and exhibits, Pla is hereby precluded from using or calling (1) any witness other than himself, and (2) any exhibit not previously disclosed to Dft before May 16, 2008 in responding to Dft's Motion for Summary Judgment or at trial. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 10/2/08. (KMG, )
September 2, 2008 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE that Pla's Response to Dft's Motion for Summary, docket # 44 , is STRICKEN for non-compliance with the Local Rules. Pla shall re-file his Response with double-spaced lines by 5:00 p.m. on or before Tuesday,Sept ember 16, 2008. The Response shall otherwise also comply with the Local Rules. FURTHER ORDERED that Pla shall file a separate Statement of Facts that complies in all respects with LRCiv 56.1(b)1 and the Local Rules on or before 5:00 p.m., Tuesday, Se ptember 16, 2008. FURTHER ORDERED that Pla shall show cause in writing on or before 5:00 p.m., Tuesday, September 16, 2008 why this Court should not sustain Dft's Objection, docket # 39, and enter an order precluding Pla from calling any witness es other than himself and using any exhibits at trial, if there is one, or in response to Dft's Motion for Summary Judgment for not complying with this Court's October 23, 2007 Order, docket # 34, that Pla disclose his witnesses and exhibit s by May 16, 2008. FURTHER ORDERED that Dft shall file a Reply to Pla's re-filed Response to Dft's Motion for Summary and a Reply to Pla's Response to Order to Show Cause on or before 5:00 p.m., Tuesday, September 30, 2008. Show Cause Response due by 9/16/2008.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 9/2/08. (Note: See Order for full details)(KMG)
May 25, 2007 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis without prepayment of costs or fees or the necessity of giving security therefore. Service by waiver or of the summons and complaint shall be at government expense on the defendants by the U. S. Marshal or his authorized representative.The Clerk shall forthwith notify the Plaintiff of the entry of this Order.. Signed by Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 5/21/07.(DMT, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garcia v. Qwest Communications
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angel Alberto Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Qwest Communications
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?