Telesaurus VPC, LLC v. Power et al

Plaintiff: Telesaurus VPC LLC
Defendant: Randy Power, Patricia A Power and Radiolink Corporation
Thirdparty_defendant: EWA Incorporated and Industrial Communications Association Incorporated
Thirdparty_plaintiff: Radiolink Corporation and Randy Power
Case Number: 2:2007cv01311
Filed: July 6, 2007
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: Neil V Wake
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Conversion
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 24, 2012 253 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 226 RadioLink's Motion for Sanctions. ORDER that the Clerk enter judgment in favor of Defendants RadioLink Corporation and Randy Power and against Plaintiff Telesaurus VPC, LLC, also known as Verde Systems, LLC, for attorney's fees of $107,797.50 and non-taxable costs and expenses of $5,346.02, with post-judgment interest at.019% from today's date until paid in full. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 8/24/12.(TLJ)
May 17, 2012 224 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 193 Motion for Summary Judgment. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk enter judgment in favor of Defendants against Plaintiff, and that Plaintiff take nothing. The Clerk shall terminate this case. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 5/17/12.(LAD)
October 21, 2011 174 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Ms. Power's 150 Motion to Dismiss Defendant Patricia Power is GRANTED. Defendant Patricia Power is DISMISSED as a party. See order for complete details. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 10/21/11. (NKS)
February 5, 2009 91 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Dfts' 67 Motion to Dismiss for failure to state a claim. FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk enter judgment dismissing this action with prejudice and dismissing the third-party claims as moot. The Clerk shall terminate the case. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 2/4/09.(KMG, )
September 30, 2008 65 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 48 Motion to Amend - that Pla Telesaurus's motion to amend thecomplaint is denied. Because the motion to amend is unopposed in its other respects, Telesaurus may file a new amended complaint with those unopposed allegations by October 10, 2008, without the allegations against EWA and ITA as dfts. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 9/29/08.(KMG, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Telesaurus VPC, LLC v. Power et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Telesaurus VPC LLC
Represented By: Adam R Bernstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randy Power
Represented By: Roger L Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia A Power
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Radiolink Corporation
Represented By: Roger L Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty_defendant: EWA Incorporated
Represented By: Aaron Schepler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty_defendant: Industrial Communications Association Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty_plaintiff: Radiolink Corporation
Represented By: Roger L Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty_plaintiff: Randy Power
Represented By: Roger L Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?