Daisy Mountain Fire District v. Microsoft Corporation Featured Case

Plaintiff Daisy Mountain Fire District sued defendant Microsoft Corporation on behalf of itself and similarly situated government entities, agencies and political subdivisions of the State of Arizona who have purchased Microsoft software. Plaintiff alleged that defendant violated antitrust laws by engaging in anticompetitive and monopolistic practices in the operating system software, word processing applications software, and spreadsheet applications software markets.

Plaintiff: Daisy Mountain Fire District
Defendant: Microsoft Corporation
Case Number: 2:2007cv01767
Filed: September 14, 2007
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: Edward C Voss
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 5, 2007 24 ACKNOWLEDGMENT of receipt of transfer case in District of Maryland. New Case number: JFM-07-2851 (MAP)
October 25, 2007 23 Case transferred to District of Maryland. Transmittal letter, certified copies of transfer order and docket sheet Federal Expressed this date. (MAP)
October 25, 2007 22 CERTIFIED MDL TRANSFER ORDER. Transferring case to District of Maryland to be part of MDL-1332. (MAP)
October 17, 2007 21 Featured Case ORDER pursuant to General Order 05-25 granting 18 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting 19 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting 20 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice.Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. (BAS, )(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
October 17, 2007 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 100, receipt number PHX063486 as to Robert A Rosenfeld. (BAS, )
October 17, 2007 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 100, receipt number PHX063487 as to Jessica S Pers. (BAS, )
October 17, 2007 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 100, receipt number PHX063488 as to John A Jurata, Jr. (BAS, )
October 17, 2007 20 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney John A Jurata Jr on behalf of Microsoft Corporation. (BAS, )
October 17, 2007 19 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Jessica S Pers on behalf of Microsoft Corporation. (BAS, )
October 17, 2007 18 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Robert A Rosenfeld on behalf of Microsoft Corporation. (BAS, )
October 15, 2007 17 Featured Case ORDER pursuant to General Order 05-25 granting 14 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting 15 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting 16 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice.Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. (BAS, )(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
October 15, 2007 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 100, receipt number PHX063372 as to John H Bright. (BAS, )
October 15, 2007 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 100, receipt number PHX063373 as to Raymond J Farrow. (BAS, )
October 15, 2007 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 100, receipt number PHX063374 as to Mark A Griffin. (BAS, )
October 15, 2007 16 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Raymond J Farrow on behalf of Daisy Mountain Fire District. (BAS, )
October 15, 2007 15 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Mark A Griffin on behalf of Daisy Mountain Fire District. (BAS, )
October 15, 2007 14 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney John H Bright on behalf of Daisy Mountain Fire District. (BAS, )
October 9, 2007 13 Featured Case ORDER pursuant to 11 STIPULATION, Microsoft Corporation shall have through and until 11/5/2007 to respond to the Complaint. Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 10/09/07. (DNH)
October 4, 2007 12 Featured Case Standard Civil Track Initial ORDER. Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 10/4/2007. (TCA, )
October 1, 2007 11 STIPULATION Stipulation Re Response to Complaint First Request by Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Dunkelman, Brett)
September 25, 2007 10 Miscellaneous Document: Amended Removal Letter from USDC, District of Arizona (REK)
September 24, 2007 8 Notice re Filing Notice of Potential "Tag Along Action" With Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation by Microsoft Corporation (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Notice of Potential "Tag-Along Action")(Maledon, William)
September 19, 2007 9 Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. TEXT ONLY ENTRY, NO PDF DOCUMENT ATTACHED. (MAP)
September 19, 2007 7 Minute Order Pursuant to Local Rule 3.8(a), a request has been received for a random reassignment of this case to a District Judge FURTHER ORDERED Case reassigned by random draw to Judge Stephen M. McNamee. All further pleadings/papers should now list the following COMPLETE case number: CV 07-1767-PHX-SMM. (MAP)
September 18, 2007 6 Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. TEXT ONLY ENTRY, NO PDF DOCUMENT ATTACHED. (MAP)
September 18, 2007 5 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Daisy Mountain Fire District. (Samson, Mark)
September 17, 2007 4 Miscellaneous Document: Notice of Removal Letter from USDC, District of Arizona (REK)
September 14, 2007 *****State Court record received on 9/14/2007*****NOTICE RE: Acceptance of Service by William Maledon for Microsoft Corporation on 9/4/2007.***** docketed in U.S. District Court on 9/14/2007 for case management purposes.***** (REK)
September 14, 2007 3 Magistrate Election Form Deadline (Attachments: # 1 Magistrate Consent Form)(REK)
September 14, 2007 This case has been assigned to the Honorable Edward C. Voss. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV 07-1767-PHX-ECV. (Entered by REK)
September 14, 2007 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Microsoft Corporation. (Maledon, William)
September 14, 2007 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Notice of Removal (Class Action Fairness Act) from State of Arizona, County of Maricopa, case number CV2007-013118 Filing fee received: $ 350.00, receipt number 1450733, filed by Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits A - F# 2 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet# 3 Exhibit Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet)(Maledon, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Daisy Mountain Fire District v. Microsoft Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daisy Mountain Fire District
Represented By: Raymond J Farrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Microsoft Corporation
Represented By: Brett L Dunkelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?