Hostrawser v. Astrue

Plaintiff: Gregory J. Hostrawser
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Case Number: 2:2007cv02098
Filed: October 29, 2007
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: James A Teilborg
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:427 Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 3, 2010 63 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 56 Motion for Attorney Fees. Counsel is awarded $18,492 in attorney's fees, to be paid out of the sum withheld by Defendant from Plaintiff's past-due benefits. Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 8/2/10.(LSP)
July 7, 2010 60 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that Pla's 44 Motion for Award of Attorney's Fees Pursuant to the Equal Access to Justice Act is DENIED. Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 7/7/10. (SAT)
September 5, 2008 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 14 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 21 Defendant's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 9/5/08.(DMT, ) Modified on 9/10/2008 DOCUMENT CONTAINS INCORRECT CASE NUMBER (REW, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hostrawser v. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory J. Hostrawser
Represented By: Mark Ross Caldwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?