Tsirekidze v. Syntax-Brillian Corp., et al

Plaintiff: Teimuraz Tsirekidze
Defendant: Syntax-Brillian Corp., Vincent F. Solitto, Jr. and Wayne Pratt
Case Number: 2:2007cv02204
Filed: November 14, 2007
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: John W Sedwick
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15:78m(a) Securities Exchange Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 30, 2016 390 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 389 motion to recuse. See order for details. Signed by Senior Judge Frederick J Martone on 11/30/2016.(LMR)
October 26, 2016 388 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 384 motion to disqualify lead plaintiff. See order for details. Signed by Senior Judge Frederick J Martone on 10/26/2016.(LMR)
August 18, 2009 309 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that plaintiffs shall issue their proposed form of notice to the class as soon as practicable. The notice shall reflect that a class member's request for exclusion must be postmarked no later than October 30, 2009. Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 8/18/09. (DMT, )
July 17, 2009 296 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 196 Plaintiff's Amended Motion to Certify Class. See PDF document for details. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED denying 279 Underwriter Defendants' Motion to Strike the affidavit of Marc Steinberg. Parties shall stipulate to a form of notice to the class and file it no later than August 10, 2009. Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 7/17/09.(LSP)
July 8, 2009 293 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that this court took a telephone call from Daniel Weinstein, who represented that he was a private mediator representing all of the parties in this case re: firmness of the Rule 16 scheduling order. At all events, we advised Mr. Weinstein that we would not accommodate his request, whether it was made on his own or the parties' behalf. If the request was made on behalf of the parties, the court reminds them that under Rule 7(b), Fed. R. Civ. P., "[a] request for a court order must be made by motion," not a telephone call by an intermediary. Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 7/7/09. (DMT, )
February 4, 2009 198 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 129 Motion to Dismiss FURTHER ORDERED granting in part and denying in part 135 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff's Section 10(b) and Section 20(a) claims as to Sollitto and Pratt are dismissed, Section 11, 12(a)(2) and 15 claims rem ain FURTHER ORDERED denying 146 Hodgson's Motion to Dismiss FURTHER ORDERED denying 143 Underwriters' Motion to Dismiss Case FURTHER ORDERED granting in part and denying in part 136 Grobstein's Motion to Dismiss. Section 11 claim s survives and all other claims against Grobstein are dismissed FURTHER ORDERED denying Motion for Leave to Amend the Complaint and Modify the Court's Rule 16 Scheduling Order [Lodged Doc 159] FURTHER ORDERED denying 154 Motion to Seal and requiring the Clerk to file all lodged documents...See Order for Full Details. Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 1/30/09.(MAP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tsirekidze v. Syntax-Brillian Corp., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teimuraz Tsirekidze
Represented By: Frank Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Syntax-Brillian Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vincent F. Solitto, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wayne Pratt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?