Holmes v. Barker et al

Plaintiff: Joseph C Holmes
Defendant: Russell Barker, Vaughn Becker, Don Layton, Pam Beck, Phillip Harber, John Doe and Jane Doe
Case Number: 2:2008cv00190
Filed: January 29, 2008
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Civil Rights: Other Office
County: Pinal
Presiding Judge: David G Campbell
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 26, 2008 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 25 Motion to Dismiss Case to the extent it seeks dismissal for improper venue, is denied as moot to the extent it seeks dismissal for lack of personal jurisdiction, and remains pending in all other respects. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1406(a), the Clerk is directed to transfer the case to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee (Northern Division) for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 11/26/08.(DNH)
November 19, 2008 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff's 21 Motion for Reconsideration is denied. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 11/19/08.(SAT)
September 19, 2008 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Pla's 18 Motion for appointment of counsel is denied; Pla's 17 Motion to serve dfts is denied as moot. Pla shall promptly inform the Marshals Service of the names of the specific Dfts he wishes to have served, along with the addresses or location of such Dfts. Pla shall complete service upon dfts by 10/06/08. The Clerk shall terminate this action if Pla fails to comply with this order. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 09/18/08. (ESL)
September 9, 2008 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 14 Plaintiff's Motion for assistance with Discovery. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 9/9/08.(LSP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Holmes v. Barker et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph C Holmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Russell Barker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vaughn Becker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Don Layton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pam Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phillip Harber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?