Lopez-Heredia v. Kane et al

Petitioner: Martin Lopez-Heredia
Respondent: Katrina S. Kane, Susan Lambert and Bruno Stolc
Case Number: 2:2008cv00349
Filed: February 22, 2008
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee Office
County: Pinal
Presiding Judge: David G Campbell
Referring Judge: Glenda E Edmonds (PS)
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: U.S. Government Defendant
Jury Demanded By: 28:2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Federal)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 9, 2009 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Respondents' 34 Motion for Relief from Order and Judgment. The December 2, 2008 order and judgment (Dkt. ##31-32) are vacated. The petition for writ of habeas corpus (Dkt. #1) is dismissed as moot. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 1/8/09.(KMG, )
December 2, 2008 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ***DOCUMENT VACATED PER COURT ORDER #35, FILED 1/9/09 *** ORDER The Report and Recommendation 28 is accepted. The petition for writ of habeas corpus (Dkt. #1) is granted unless, within 60 days of this order, the government provides a hearing to Pet itioner before an Immigration Judge with the power to grant him bail unless the government establishes that he is a flight risk or will be a danger to the community. The motions for preliminary injunction and temporary restraining order (Dkt.#1) are denied as moot. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 12/1/08. (KMG, ) Modified on 1/12/2009 (KMG, ).
September 29, 2008 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Respondents' 27 Motion to hold proceedings in abeyance. Any objections to the R&R shall be filed on 10/6/08. Any responses to objections shall be filed by 10/24/08. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 9/26/08.(KMG)
September 4, 2008 28 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Recommendation: grant the petition; written objections due w/in 10 days of being served R&R. Signed by Magistrate Judge Glenda E Edmonds on 9/4/08. See attached pdf for complete information. (KMF, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lopez-Heredia v. Kane et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Martin Lopez-Heredia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Katrina S. Kane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Susan Lambert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Bruno Stolc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?