Cornelio v. Intel Corporation

Plaintiff: Joao Cornelio
Defendant: Intel Corporation
Case Number: 2:2008cv00538
Filed: March 19, 2008
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Civil Rights: Jobs Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: James A Teilborg
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 3, 2016 66 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 63 Plaintiff's Motion to Set Aside Judgment. Defendant is excused from responding to any further post-judgment filings by Plaintiff unless ordered to do so by the Court. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 03-03-16.(GAR)
August 27, 2015 61 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 59 Plaintiff's Motion for Request for Explanation/Certification of Denial to Re-Open Case. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 8/27/15.(LSP)
September 17, 2013 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 47 Plaintiff's Motion to Reopen Case; denying as moot 51 Defendant's Motion to Strike; denying as moot 53 Plaintiff's Motion for Status; denying 54 Plaintiff's Motion to Introduce Evidence. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 9/17/2013.(VPB)
July 10, 2009 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 31 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 7/10/09.(DMT, )
September 5, 2008 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 15 Motion to Strike 10 Plaintiff's Jury Demand. Clerk of Court shall strike docket # 10 .. Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 9/4/08.(DMT, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cornelio v. Intel Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Intel Corporation
Represented By: Michael D Moberly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joao Cornelio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?