Saunders v. Astrue

Plaintiff: Marvin A Saunders
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Case Number: 2:2008cv00595
Filed: March 27, 2008
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: Mary H Murguia
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 24, 2012 54 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER granting 53 Plaintiff's counsel's Motion to Modify Court Order. The Court's order 52 is modified to reflect attorneys' fees in the amount of $26,908.00. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 5/24/12.(TLJ)
May 2, 2012 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Plaintiff's 49 Motion for Attorney Fees in the amount of $29,843.25. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 5/1/12. (LFIG)
November 1, 2011 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 40 Motion to Set Aside Judgment. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 11/1/2011.(NVO)
August 25, 2011 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER the case is remanded to Defendant for an award of benefits. The Clerk is directed to terminate this action. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 8/25/11. (TLJ)
July 22, 2011 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 26 Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 7/22/2011.(NVO)
July 14, 2011 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. The parties shall file memoranda on or before 7/22/2011 addressing how this case should proceed on remand. The memoranda shall not exceed 5 pages in length. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 7/14/2011. (NVO)
September 16, 2009 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 12 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 16 Defendant's Cross Motion for Summary Judgment. ORDER directing the Clerk of the Court to enter judgment accordinlgy. Signed by Judge Mary H Murguia on 9/11/09.(TLJ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Saunders v. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marvin A Saunders
Represented By: Eric Glenn Slepian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?