Okonkwo v. Glendale Union High School District et al

Plaintiff: Charles U Okonkwo
Defendant: Glendale Union High School District, Michael Fowler, Linda Rossness, Jennifer Johnson, Warren K Jacobson, Marrie Kerwin, Vicki Johnson, Kevin Clayborn, Steve Burke, Kathy Jacka and Donna Stout
Case Number: 2:2008cv00633
Filed: April 2, 2008
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Civil Rights: Other Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: Mary H Murguia
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 20, 2010 101 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 94 Defendants' Motion for Entry of Judgment; denying 95 Defendant Glendale Union High School District, et al's Motion for Attorney Fees; denying 100 Plaintiff Charles Okonkwo's Motion for Reconsideration/and or Mot ion to Vacate the Court's 2/25/10 Order. ORDER directing the Clerk to issue a separate Entry of Judgment to reflect Judge Anderson's 3/4/09 Order sanctioning Plaintiff. The separate Entry of Judgment shall be in favor of Defendants Glendale Union High School District, Michael Fowler, Linda Rossness, Jennifer Johnson, Warren K. Jacobson, Vicki Johnson, Kevin Clayborn, Steve Burke, Kathy Jacka, and Donna Stout. The Judgment shall be against Plaintiff Charles Okonkwo, and shall be for the sum of $3,958.50, plus interest at the legal rate until the Judgment is paid in fullSigned by Judge Mary H Murguia on 5/17/10.(TLJ)
February 25, 2010 91 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER striking Mr. Okonkwo's pro se filings made on 2/12/10 87 and 88 . ORDER denying as moot all other pending motions 58 , 78 , 86 , and 90 . ORDER dismissing Charles Okonkwo's Complaint in its entirety for failing to comply with an Order of the Court. ORDER directing the Clerk of the Court enter judgment accordingly Signed by Judge Mary H Murguia on 2/25/10.(TLJ)
October 28, 2009 72 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 62 Motion for Recusal. Signed by Judge Mary H Murguia on 10/27/09.(KSP)
March 4, 2009 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 41 Motion for Sanctions. Defendants Glendale Union High School District, et al. are hereby collectively awarded fees in the sum of $3,958.50 against Plaintiff Charles Okonkwo. Plaintiff Charles Okonkwo shall pay this award of fe es on/before 4/10/09. IT IS RECOMMENDED that if the fees are not paid in full on/before 4/10/09, a separate Judgment, pursuant to Rule 58(b)(2)(B), Fed.R.Civ.P., be entered in favor of Defendants Glendale Union High School District, et al. and agains t Plaintiff Charles Okonkwo in the sum $3,958.50, plus interest at the legal rate until the Judgment is paid in full.FURTHER ORDERED Overruling and denying without prejudice 38 Motion Objecting to Judge Andersons Order/Motion for Reconsideration for New Settlement Conference Date. FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants settlement conference memorandum shall be filed under seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 3/4/09.(MAP)
November 19, 2008 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 32 Motion to Continue. Settlement Conference reset for 12/5/2008 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson. Affirming all other orders contained in the undersigneds Settlement Conference Order, docket #21, except for the date and time of said settlement conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 11/18/08.(DMT, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Okonkwo v. Glendale Union High School District et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles U Okonkwo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glendale Union High School District
Represented By: John Greg Coulter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Fowler
Represented By: John Greg Coulter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda Rossness
Represented By: John Greg Coulter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Johnson
Represented By: John Greg Coulter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warren K Jacobson
Represented By: John Greg Coulter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marrie Kerwin
Represented By: John Greg Coulter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vicki Johnson
Represented By: John Greg Coulter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Clayborn
Represented By: John Greg Coulter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Burke
Represented By: John Greg Coulter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathy Jacka
Represented By: John Greg Coulter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donna Stout
Represented By: John Greg Coulter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?