Ball v. Schubert

Plaintiff: Dennis Andrew Ball
Defendant: Jonathan P. Schubert
Case Number: 2:2008cv00746
Filed: April 18, 2008
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Real Property: Other Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: David K Duncan
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Fiduciary Duty

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 8, 2009 74 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 73 Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration. Further Ordered that Defendants shall file a signed copy of document 67 by Monday, July 13, 2009. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 7/7/09.(DMT, )
July 1, 2009 71 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Pla's 65 Motion for Leave to Retain Counsel for Third Amended Complaint is DENIED. That Dfts 67 Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. Dfts are awarded costs upon their compliance with Local Rule of Civil Procedure 54.1. Pla's 69 Motion to Strike is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court is directed to file Pla's 66 Lodged Notice of Withdrawal and to TERMINATE this action. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 07/01/09. (ESL)
May 21, 2009 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the Motion to Dismiss of Defendants Southwest Fiduciary, Gregory P. Dovico, Peggy Ann Dovico, and Anna Dovico (CV-09-0122 Dkt. # 27) is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. Denying as moot 46 Plaintiff's Motion to Amend/Correct; gra nting 48 Plaintiff's Motion to deny joinder. All future case filings in this matter shall utilize this amended caption: In re Dennis Andrew Ball, personally and as Beneficiary of the Eleanor R. Ball IrreLvg Trust 05/10/01. That Mr. Ball shall have until June 22, 2009 in which to file a Third Amended Complaint that conforms to the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure,the District's Local Rules, and the dictates of the Court's Orders. That if Mr. Ball does not comply with this Order, the Clerk of the Court is directed to dismiss this action without further notice. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 5/21/09.(DMT, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ball v. Schubert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Andrew Ball
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan P. Schubert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?