Bryant v. Schriro et al

Petitioner: Leon Allen Bryant
Respondent: Dora Schriro and Arizona Attorney General, State of
Case Number: 2:2008cv00831
Filed: May 2, 2008
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Habeas Corpus (General) Office
County: Pinal
Presiding Judge: David G Campbell
Referring Judge: Jacqueline J Marshall (PS)
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 29, 2009 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ACCEPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS 12 . Petitioner's Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus 1 is denied. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate this action. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 6/26/2009. (LAD)
April 21, 2009 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, the Clerk is directed to mail a complete copy of the 12 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION to Petitioner; Petitioner shall file any objection to the R&R by 5/15/09; Respondents shall file a response to the objections by 5/29/09. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 4/20/90. (REW, )
March 19, 2009 12 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus : Recommending that that the District Court, after its independent review, DISMISS WITH PREJUDICE Petitioner's Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline J Marshall on 3/19/09. (KDT, ) Modified on 3/19/2009 (KDT, ).****SEE ATTACHED PDF FOR COMPLETE INFORMATION.****

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bryant v. Schriro et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Leon Allen Bryant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Dora Schriro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Arizona Attorney General, State of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?