Traylor v. Avnet, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Levanna C Traylor
Defendant: Avnet, Inc. and Avnet Pension Plan
Case Number: 2:2008cv00918
Filed: May 13, 2008
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Labor: E.R.I.S.A. Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: Frederick J Martone
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 29:1001 E.R.I.S.A.: Employee Retirement

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 17, 2016 206 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 205 Unopposed Motion for Approval of Second Distribution to the Class of Net Residual Settlement Funds. See order for details. Signed by Senior Judge Frederick J Martone on 8/17/2016.(LMR)
April 14, 2010 204 Opinion or Order of the Court FINAL ORDER AND JUDGMENT APPROVING SETTLEMENT AND DISMISSING THIS ACTION WITH PREJUDICE. The Parties shall carry out all the terms of the Agreement. Except as otherwise provided in the Agreement and this Judgment, Plaintiffs and the Class Members sha ll take nothing in this Litigation and the Court hereby dismisses the claims of Plaintiffs and the Class Members against Defendants with prejudice and without costs. Class Counsel is entitled Attorneys' Fees in an amount equal to 25% of the Total Settlement Amount, i.e., the amount of $8.5 million, and to costs and expenses in the amount of $400,000. Named Plaintiffs, Levanna C Traylor, Kevin R Moses, James Frederic Coy, and Gwyn M Moriarty are each awarded an additional  6;3,000; named Plaintiffs Linda M Phillips, Thomas G Small, Dwayne E Cohen, and Steve A Dison, are each awarded an additional $3,000. This Court will retain continuing jurisdiction for a reasonable period over all Parties and Class Members solely for purposes of enforcing this Judgment and, pursuant to it, the Settlement. This is a final and appealable judgment (see document for full details). Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 4/13/10. (REW)
July 9, 2009 150 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 144 Motion to approve two modifications to the class definitions certified by order dated 5/26/09 141 and granting plaintiffs' unopposed request to appoint Rust Consulting, Inc., as Notice Administrator. Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 7/8/09. (see order for full details)(DMT, )
May 26, 2009 141 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS ORDERED GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART plas' 88 Motion for Class Certification. Specifically, pursuant to Rule 23(b)(3), the Lump Sum Class is certified consisting of: All persons for whom the Plan maintained an account at any time after 12/31/93 and who received a lump sum distribution from the Plan between 1/1/94 and 8/17/06. Pursuant to Rule 23(b) (1)(A) or (b)(2), the Restricted Participant Class is certified consisting of: All persons for whom the Plan maintained an account at any time after 12/31/93 and who between 1/1/94 and 8/17/06 were not offered a lump sum distribution upon termination of their employment because the Plan determined that the present value of their pre-1/1/94 benefit exceeded their Cash Balance Account. Pursuant to Rule 23(c)(1)(B) and Rule 23(g), the Gottesdiener Law Firm, PLLC, the Blessing Law Firm, and Martin & Bonnett, PLLC, are appointed class counsel. The motion for certification is denied with respect to Lump Sum Class members who elected annuities and to the Unrestricted Participant Class. Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 5/22/09. (SAT)
February 13, 2009 104 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 66 Motion for Partial Dismissal. (See order for details). Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 2/13/2009. (LAD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Traylor v. Avnet, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Levanna C Traylor
Represented By: Eli Gottesdiener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Avnet, Inc.
Represented By: Damond R Mace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Avnet Pension Plan
Represented By: Damond R Mace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?