BRT Funding, LLC V. Carlsbad Development I, LLC, et al

Plaintiff: BRT Funding, LLC
Defendant: Jane Doe Bennion, Tad Gygi, Richard C. Bennion, Carlsbad Development I, LLC, Jane Doe Gygi, Randy Krantz, Jane Doe Krantz, D. Gregory Hales and Jane Doe Hales
Case Number: 2:2008cv01151
Filed: June 20, 2008
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Contract: Other Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: Frederick J Martone
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 24, 2010 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS ORDERED DENYING pla BRT Funding, LLC's 56 Motion to Stay. Pla shall respond to dfts' motion to dismiss no later than 2/26/2010. Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 2/24/10. (SAT)
August 12, 2009 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting pla's 28 Motion for Default Judgment as to Carlsbad, Richard Bennion, Tad Gygi, Randy Krantz, and D. Gregory Hales. Judgment shall be entered in favor of pla in the amount of $21,604,857.76 with 24.5 percent per annum interest accruing on the principal balance of the loan from 3/20/09 until it is paid in full. Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 8/12/2009. (LAD)
June 8, 2009 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part dfts' 34 Motion for relief from entry of default. Entry of default is set aside as to Joan Bennion, Colleen Gygi, Susan Krantz, and Terri Hales; Pla shall 15 days from the date of this order to provid e additional evidence. Dfts shall have to and including 07/10/09 to respond to pla's motion as supplemented; granting Philip Mitchell and Corey Foley's Unopposed 37 Motion to Withdraw as Attorneys of record for dfts. This action is stayed as to dft Carlsbad ONLY and will be dismissed against dft Carlsbad without further notice 60 days from the date of this order, unless the court is advised that the bankcruptcy stay has been lifted by the bankruptcy judge, or that pla's motion to lift the stay has not been ruled on. Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 06/05/09. (NOTE: See attached order for full details) (ESL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BRT Funding, LLC V. Carlsbad Development I, LLC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe Bennion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tad Gygi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard C. Bennion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carlsbad Development I, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe Gygi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randy Krantz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe Krantz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Gregory Hales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe Hales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRT Funding, LLC
Represented By: Sean Keenan McElenney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?