Johnson, et al v. First American Title Insurance Company

Plaintiff: John C Johnson, Daniel Perez and Elizabeth Perez
Defendant: First American Title Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2008cv01184
Filed: June 26, 2008
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: P.I.: Other Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: David G Campbell
Nature of Suit: Defendant
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 14, 2012 359 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 353 Motion for Attorney Fees. Pursuant to the Settlement Agreement between the parties, attorneys' fees and costs in the total amount of $300,000 are awarded in favor of Plaintiffs and against Defendant. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 5/14/2012.(NVO)
September 1, 2011 336 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 303 Defendant's Motion to Strike ; Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment 317 is granted on the issue of liability on the unjust enrichment claim, and denied on the question of damages; denying 321 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. The Court will set a final pretrial conference by separate order (see attached pdf for complete information). Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 9/1/11.(TLJ)
March 2, 2011 300 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 259 Motion to decertify; denying 268 Motion for Discovery; granting 284 Motion to Seal Document. The Clerk has sealed the Declaration of Bruce McFarlane (Doc. 269) and the Declaration of Reed Simpson (Docs. 270, 271). Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 3/1/11.(DMT)
November 22, 2010 257 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Defendant's motion for decertification 235 is granted. Pursuant to Rules 23(c)(1)(C) and (2)(B), the class is decertified with respect to class members who purchased policies from agents of Defendant and who cannot be provided individua l notice. The parties shall, by December 1, 2010, file a joint revised class definition. Plaintiffs shall mail notice to members of the class by December 10, 2010. Class members shall have until January 25, 2011 to respond to the notice and opt ou t of the class. Plaintiffs shall notify Defendant of the class members who have opted out of the class by February 7, 2011. The deadline for filing dispositive motions is February 21, 2011. All other terms of the Court's Second Case Management Order (Doc. 108) remain in effect.Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 11/22/10. (DMT)
August 27, 2010 237 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 217 and 218 Plaintiffs' Motion to compel, see PDF document for details; denying without prejudice 235 Defendant's Motion for decertification. A conference call to address modifications to the second case management order (Doc. 108) is set for October 5, 2010, at 3:00 p.m. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 8/27/10.(LSP)
June 8, 2010 222 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 198 ORDER re temporal scope of class 102 . Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 6/8/2010. Unfair discrimination claim decertified. Class definition for unjust enrichment claim is revised as set forth in this order. (NVO)
April 14, 2010 198 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re temporal scope of class 102 . Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 4/14/2010. (NVO)
February 2, 2010 166 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER finding as moot 158 Motion to Strike; granting 161 Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 2/2/2010.(NVO)
August 12, 2009 102 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 68 Motion to Certify Class. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 8/12/2009.(NVO)
November 7, 2008 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 6 Motion to Dismiss Case. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 11/7/2008.(NVJ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson, et al v. First American Title Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First American Title Insurance Company
Represented By: Meridyth Marie Andresen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John C Johnson
Represented By: Garrett W Wotkyns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Perez
Represented By: Garrett W Wotkyns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Perez
Represented By: Garrett W Wotkyns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?