Best Western International, Inc. v. Sharda, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Best Western International, Inc.
Defendant: Sharda, LLC and Muljibah M Chaudhari
Case Number: 2:2008cv01219
Filed: July 1, 2008
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Contract: Other Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: David G Campbell
Nature of Suit: Both
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 15:1051 Trademark Infringement

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 30, 2009 133 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: Pla Best Western International, Inc.'s 114 Motion for Award of Attorneys' Fees is granted in part and denied in part. Pursuant to A.R.S. § 12-341.01(A), atty fees in the total amount of $122,729.77 are awarded in favor of Pla and against Dfts, jointly and severally. The request for an award of atty fees pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1927 is denied. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 10/30/09. (SAT)
October 6, 2009 130 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 117 Motion to Amend the Judgment. The Court will enter a separate amended judgment. Pla's 120 Motion to Register Judgment is granted. (See document for further details). Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 10/5/2009. (LAD)
June 22, 2009 107 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS ORDERED Dfts' 96 Motion for a Rule 56(f) Continuance is denied. Dfts' 99 Motion to Withdraw admissions is denied. Pla's 81 Motion for Summary Judgment (Dkt. #81) is granted. Summary jgm is granted in favor of Pla an d against Dfts (i) on counts one and two of the complaint in the amount of $45,649.11, plus interest at the rate of 1.5% per month until paid in full, (ii) on count three of the complaint in the amount of $141,868.20, and (iii) on Dfts ' counterclaims and affirmative defenses. Pla's request for a permanent injunction is denied. Pla shall file a report regarding the status of counts four through nine of the complaint by 6/26/09. If Pla does not intend to prosecute those claims, it shall file an appropriate form of jgm consistent with this order. The 105 Joint Motion to Amend case management order is denied. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 6/22/09. (SAT)
January 6, 2009 76 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 70 Motion for Attorney Fees; granting 71 Motion for Attorney Fees. On or before 1/30/2009, Defendant shall pay $12,477.56 to Plaintiff. On or before 1/30/2009, defense counsel Jeffrey Goldstein (not Defendant) shall pay $1,000 to Plaintiff. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 1/6/2009.(NVJ)
November 24, 2008 68 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 50 Motion for Sanctions. Defendants are warned that further violations of orders or rules will result in more severe sanctions, including the possibility of default judgment and dismissal. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 11/24/2008.(NVJ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Best Western International, Inc. v. Sharda, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Best Western International, Inc.
Represented By: Arthur W Pederson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sharda, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Muljibah M Chaudhari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?