Guillen v. Thompson et al
Plaintiff: Karl Louis Guillen
Defendant: Gerald Thompson, Paula Berger, John Palosaari, Dora Schriro, Linderman, Herman, Kingsland, Harris, Okochobee, Yielding, Hatfield, Dennis Cooper, Webb, Kocho, Rios, Butryn, Bruemmer, Mendoza, Parsons, Smith, Macabuhay, Jane Does and John Does
Case Number: 2:2008cv01279
Filed: July 10, 2008
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Arizona
Office: Prisoner - Prison Condition Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: Lawrence O Anderson (PS)
Presiding Judge: Mary H Murguia
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 201 ORDER denying 199 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Mary H Murguia on 8/10/10.(DMT)
June 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 196 ORDER - The reference to the Magistrate is withdrawn as to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc. #135), Plaintiff's Motion to Strike (Doc. #151), Plaintiff's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc. #160), Plaintiff's Motio n for TRO and PI (Doc. #178), and Plaintiff's Motion for Emergency Examination (Doc. #183). ORDERED granting 135 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 160 cross-motion for summary judgment; denying 151 Motion to Strike; denying 178 Motion for TRO; denying 178 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; denying 183 Motion for Emergency Examination. The Clerk of Court must dismiss this action and enter judgment accordingly. Signed by Judge Mary H Murguia on 6/23/10.(LAD)
May 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 193 ORDER withdrawing the reference to the Magistrate Judge as to Plaintiff's Emergency Notice and Request for TRO/PI; denying Plaintiff's 166 Emergency Motion for TRO/PI. Signed by Judge Mary H Murguia on 5/3/10.(REW)
March 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 188 ORDER that the reference to the Magistrate Judge is withdrawn as to pla's motion for reconsideration and that the 129 Motion is denied. Signed by Judge Mary H Murguia on 3/26/10.(LAD)
March 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 187 ORDER denying 143 Plaintiff's "Motion for Order: Returning Journal and Legal Book" and denying 154 "Request for Emergency 3-Judge Panel, Release Order, and Federal Receivership". Signed by Judge Mary H Murguia on 3/24/10.(LSP)
October 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER that the reference to the Magistrate Judge is withdrawn as to Plaintiff's Motion 108 for Preliminary Injunction (Medical Treatment) Based Upon New Evidence, and the motion is denied. Signed by Judge Mary H Murguia on 10/15/09.(KMG, )
October 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER withdrawing the reference to the Magistrate Judge as to Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration; denying Plaintiff's 107 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Mary H Murguia on 10/2/09.(REW, )
August 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER that Pla's Emergency 47 Motion for TRO is denied. Pla's 54 Motion for Issuance of Subpoena and Production of Documents; 55 Motion for Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum with Medical Provision Order; 56 Motion for Issuance of Subpoena to Compel Testimony and Production of Documents; 58 Motion for Emergency Medical Release Order by 3-Judge Panel; and 59 Motion for Expedited Hearing and Oral Argument are all denied. Signed by Judge Mary H Murguia on 08/11/09. (ESL)
July 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER within 5 days from the date this order is filed, dfts must file a response to pla's 47 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order. Pla may file a reply within 5 days from the receipt of the response. Signed by Judge Mary H Murguia on 7/2/2009. (LAD)
December 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Pla's 10 Motion for Extension of Time is granted to the extent that his First Amended Complaint is deemed timely filed; Pla's 12 Motion for status of case is granted to the extent set forth herein. Counts II-X and Dfts Thompson, B erger, Palosaari, Doe, Breummer, Johnson, Kingsland, Herman, Linderman, Hatfield, Webb, Cooper, Butryn, Smith, Rios, Kocho, Parsons, Mendoza, Sikes, Curran, Zavala, and Coleman are dismissed without prejudice. The Clerk of Court must send Pla a servi ce packet including the 11 First Amended Complaint, this Order, and both summons and request for waiver forms for Dfts Schriro and Macubuhay. This matter is referred to Magistrate Judge Lawrence O. Anderson for further proceedings. Signed by Judge Mary H Murguia on 12/19/08. (ESL)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Guillen v. Thompson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karl Louis Guillen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gerald Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paula Berger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Palosaari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dora Schriro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linderman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Herman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kingsland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Okochobee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yielding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hatfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Webb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kocho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rios
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Butryn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruemmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mendoza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Parsons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Macabuhay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?