United States of America v. $93,110.00 in U.S. Currency

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: $93,110.00 in U.S. Currency
Case Number: 2:2008cv01499
Filed: August 14, 2008
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Drug Related Seizure of Property Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: Lawrence O Anderson
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: U.S. Government Plaintiff
Jury Demanded By: 21:881 Forfeiture Property-Drugs

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 28, 2011 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that pursuant to LRCiv 83.1(f)(2)(E) and the Court's inherent authority, Plaintiff's Response, 58 , to Claimant's Motion In Limine Regarding Expert Testimony and Expert Report is hereby STRICKEN without prejudice. The Clerk o f Court, however, is kindly directed to retain as a part of the record attorney Reid C. Pixler's affidavit, doc. 58-1 at 2-22. Plaintiff may re-file its response in opposition to Claimant's Motion In Limine, provided it is re-filed on or before Monday, January 9, 2012 and shall comply in all aspects with the District Court's Local Rules. Further violations of the District Court's Local Rules or prior court orders by Plaintiff's counsel may result in the imposition of sanctions.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 12/28/11. (DMT)
January 31, 2011 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 49 Stipulation/Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery, Discovery to be completed by 8/31/11. Scheduling Order of 6/11/09 is modified as indicated in this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 1/31/11. (see order for full details)(DMT)
July 12, 2010 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Pla's Motion Doc. 46 for Extension of Discovery Deadline, as to discovery requested by Pla via the MLAT process, is GRANTED. FURTHER ORDERED that the June 11, 2009 Scheduling Order is modified as follows only: 1. Except for impeachm ent evidence, disclosure of all known witnesses, exhibits and other matters under Rule 26(a)(3), Fed.R.Civ. P. and supplementation of all discovery pursuant to Rule 26(e), Fed.R.Civ. P., shall be made by Friday, January 14, 2011. 2. Completion of all discovery: Friday, February 18, 2011. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that there will be no further extensions to allow the Government or Claimant to complete discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 7/12/10.(KMG)
November 20, 2008 22 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT AND ORDER OF FORFEITURE : that Plaintiffs Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings, 17 , is GRANTED. That the Defendant res in this action, $93,110.00 in U.S. currency, is hereby forfeited to the United States pursuant to 31 U.S.C. §5 332(a)(1) and (c). That the res is also currency for which no Currency and Monetary Instrument Report was filed when Claimant transported the currency across the United States-Mexico Border and is also forfeited to the United States. The United State s Marshals Service shall delay disposing of the forfeited res pending further order of the Court, including after the resolution of the issues identified herein, specifically, any Petition filed by Claimant seeking to reduce or eliminate the forfeiture of the res pursuant to 18 U.S.C. § 983(g). Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 11/19/08. (see judgment for full details) (DMT, )
September 15, 2008 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER; Scheduling Conference set for 10/23/2008 03:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson. Joint Case Management Report Deadline set for 10/16/2008. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 9/15/08. (REW, )
September 8, 2008 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 6 Motion to Change Venue/Transfer Case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 09/08/08.(DNH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. $93,110.00 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Reid Charles Pixler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $93,110.00 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?