Bogner et al v. Masari Investments, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Renia Bogner and Jeff Bogner
Defendant: Masari Investments, LLC, Joseph F. Musumeci, P.C. and Joseph F Musumeci
Case Number: 2:2008cv01511
Filed: August 18, 2008
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Other Statutory Actions Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: David G Campbell
Referring Judge:
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 24, 2010 81 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 67 Motion for Attorney Fees. The request for an award of costs is denied. Pursuant to 15 U.S.C. § 1692k(a)(3), the terms of the parties' settlement agreement (Dkt. #60-1 at 5), and Rule 23(h) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Plaintiffs are awarded attorneys' fees in the total amount of $63,161.00. Pursuant to Rule 23(e), and on the basis of the Court's previous determinations (Dkt. ##61, 66), the class action settlemen t agreement (Dkt. #60-1) is approved as a fair, reasonable, and adequate resolution of the class claims. The Court approves Community Legal Services, Inc. as the cy pres recipient of funds in this case, with the proviso that the funds shall be used for educational purposes (see Dkt. #66 at 2). The Clerk is directed to terminate this action. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 6/24/10.(LAD)
October 28, 2009 61 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 60 Motion for approval of class action settlement agreement. The deadline for notice to all class members shall be 12/4/2009; opt-out deadline or time for filing objections to the proposed settlement agre ement shall be 2/5/2010. Proof of notice to all potential class members and copies of any responses or objections received from class members due 2/19/2010. Fairness hearing set for 2/26/2010 at 4:00 PM. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 10/28/2009.(NVO)
July 22, 2009 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 51 Motion to Certify Class. Defendant shall provide names and addresses of class members to Plaintiffs by 8/21/2009; Plaintiffs shall mail notices to all class members by 9/11/2009; deadline for class members to opt-out of or intervene in action is 11/13/09. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 7/22/2009.(NVO)
June 2, 2009 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 28 Motion to Certify Class. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 6/2/2009.(NVO)
May 19, 2009 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 22 Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 5/19/2009.(NVO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bogner et al v. Masari Investments, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Renia Bogner
Represented By: Richard N Groves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeff Bogner
Represented By: Richard N Groves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Masari Investments, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph F. Musumeci, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph F Musumeci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?