Magedson et al v. Whitney Information Network, Inc. et al Featured Case

Plaintiff: Edward Magedson and Xcentric Ventures, LLC
Defendant: Whitney Information Network, Inc., Ronald S. Simon, Rothstein, Rosenfeldt Adler, P.A., Christopher Sharp, Shawn Birken and Steven N. Lippman
Case Number: 2:2008cv01715
Filed: September 17, 2008
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: P.I.: Other Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: David G Campbell
Nature of Suit: Both
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Tort/Non-Motor Vehicle

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 26, 2009 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 34 Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 2/26/2009.(NVO)
January 16, 2009 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 24 Motion to Dismiss Case for Lack of Jurisdiction; denying 14 Motion to Change Venue/Transfer Case; denying 17 Motion to Dismiss Case for Lack of Jurisdiction. The Court will schedule a Case Management Conference by separate order. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 1/16/2009.(NVO)
September 17, 2008 1
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of Arizona, Maricopa County, case number CV2008-01196 Filing fee received: $ 350.00, receipt number 09700000000002229670, filed by Whitney Information Network, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 4 Supplement Supplemental Cover Sheet for Case Removed from Another Jurisdiction)(Frazier, Roger)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Magedson et al v. Whitney Information Network, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Magedson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Xcentric Ventures, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Whitney Information Network, Inc.
Represented By: Roger Wayne Frazier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald S. Simon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rothstein, Rosenfeldt Adler, P.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Sharp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shawn Birken
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven N. Lippman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?