Savage et al v. NIC, Inc

Plaintiff: Allan Savage and Pamela Savage
Defendant: NIC, Inc
Case Number: 2:2008cv01780
Filed: September 29, 2008
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Consumer Credit Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: James A Teilborg
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 9, 2010 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that Plas' 41 Amended Motion for Award of Attorneys' Fees is granted. The Clerk of the Court shall enter jgm in the amount of$17,442.30 in favor of Plas and against Dft. Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 6/8/10. (SAT)
April 6, 2010 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 36 Defendant's Motion to Set Aside. The Clerk shall vacate 35 Order on Motion for Attorney Fees filed on 1/11/10. See PDF document for details. Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 4/6/10.(LSP)
January 11, 2010 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 32 Motion for Attorney Fees and Costs in the amount of $16,290.50. Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 1/8/10.(LAD, )
July 28, 2009 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying in part dft's 22 Motion for Summary Judgment, consistent with this order. FURTHER ORDERED that summary judgment is awarded in part to plas, consistent with this order. FURTHER ORDERED dismissing with prejudice the claims found in subsections (b) and (g) of Count I of pla's complaint. Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 7/28/2009.(LAD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Savage et al v. NIC, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NIC, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allan Savage
Represented By: Gail Elizabeth Maiorana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela Savage
Represented By: Gail Elizabeth Maiorana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?