Nolan v. Kempthorne

Plaintiff: Richard L. Nolan
Defendant: Dirk Kempthorne
Case Number: 2:2008cv01884
Filed: October 14, 2008
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Civil Rights: Jobs Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: James A Teilborg
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: U.S. Government Defendant
Jury Demanded By: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 30, 2009 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Dft's 19 Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint is granted with prejudice. The Clerk is directed to enter judgment for Defendant and against Plaintiff, and to terminate this action. Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 10/29/09.(ESL, )
April 3, 2009 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING Pla's Motion 5 for Court Appointed Attorney. FURTHER ORDERED DENYING Dft's Motion 13 to Dismiss, BUT GRANTING Dft's Alternative Motion for More Definite Statement. FURTHER ORDERED that Pla shall file his Second Amende d Complaint by Monday, April 27, 2009. If Pla does not file his Second Amended Complaint by that date, the Clerk of the Court shall automatically dismiss this case pursuant to Rule 41(b) without further order of the Court. Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 4/3/09.(KMG, )
March 13, 2009 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS ORDERED DENYING AS MOOT the 9 Motion for More Definite Statement. Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 3/13/09.(SAT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nolan v. Kempthorne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard L. Nolan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dirk Kempthorne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?