Everson et al v. Everson et al

Plaintiff: David K Everson and Patricia M Everson
Defendant: David D Everson, Kristy Everson, Mandalay Homes, Inc., Estate of Louis B. Schaeffer, Gene Schaeffer and Russell Schaeffer
Case Number: 2:2008cv01980
Filed: October 28, 2008
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Contract: Other Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: G Murray Snow
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:1331 Fed. Question

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 16, 2011 156 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Plaintiff's 155 Motion to Alter or Amend Judgment Pursuant to Rule 59(e) is denied and the action shall remain terminated. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 11/16/11.(ESL)
October 11, 2011 153 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Defendant's 147 Motion for Summary Judgment. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate this action. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 10/11/11.(ESL)
January 19, 2011 144 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, denying Defendants' oral Motion to Compel Discovery without prejudice to Defendants seeking to establish the extraordinary circumstances necessary for the Court to take up this motion. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 1/18/11. (REW)
December 15, 2010 138 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Plaintiffs' 135 Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint; denying Plaintiffs' 136 Motion to Deem Admissions. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 12/15/10.(REW)
November 24, 2010 123 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, granting Defendants' 107 Motion to Amend/Correct "Deemed" Admissions; denying as moot Plaintiffs' 106 Motion to Deem Admisstions; granting Plaintiff's 118 Motion to Modify Answer to Request No. 8; denying Plaintiff's 116 Motion to Strike Response in Opposition to Motion; denying Plaintiff's 109 Amended Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 11/24/10.(REW)
June 8, 2010 82 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 69 Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment as to David D. Everson, et al.; denying 72 Plaintiff's Motion to Set Aside re Defendants' Answer to Amended Complaint; denying 77 Plaintiff's Objection and Motion to S trike and/or Set Aside Defendants' Response; denying 78 Plaintiffs' Motion for Default Judgment as to Estate of Louis B. Schaeffer; and denying 80 Plaintiffs' Motion Pursuant to Rule 60(b)(4). Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 6/7/10.(LSP)
March 24, 2010 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that Plas' 54 Motion for Reconsideration is DENIED. FURTHER ORDERED that Plas' 57 Motion for Oral Telephonic Argument on the Motion for Reconsideration is DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 3/24/10. (SAT)
March 2, 2010 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 44 Motion for Summary Judgment of defendant The Estate of Louis B. Schaeffer. Clerk of Court shall TERMINATE The Estate of Louis D. Schaeffer from this action.Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 3/2/10.(DMT)
September 24, 2009 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Timothy J. Thomason and Nicole S. Hawkesworth provide the basis for their authority to represent the Estate of Louis B. Schaeffer - inasmuch as no personal representative with power to defend the Estate has been appointed. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Mr. Thomason and Ms. Hawkesworth file a memorandum with the requested information on or before September 30, 2009, if they do not otherwise move to withdraw the Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 9/23/09. (LSP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Everson et al v. Everson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David K Everson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia M Everson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David D Everson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kristy Everson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mandalay Homes, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Estate of Louis B. Schaeffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gene Schaeffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Russell Schaeffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?