Wilcher v. United States of America

Petitioner: Jeanette B Wilcher
Respondent: United States of America
Case Number: 2:2008cv02039
Filed: November 4, 2008
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence Office
County: Maricopa
Referring Judge: Michelle H Burns (PS)
Presiding Judge: Earl H Carroll
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: U.S. Government Defendant
Jury Demanded By: 28:2255 Motion to Vacate / Correct Illegal Sentence

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 28, 2009 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS - IT IS ORDERED adopting the Magistrate Judge's 9 Report and Recommendation filed 4/30/09. FURTHER ORDERED that Movant's 1 Motion to Vacate, Set Aside, or Correct Sentence Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 2255 is denied. FURTHER ORDERED that Movant's 16 Motion for a Court Appointed Attorney is denied. Signed by Judge Earl H Carroll on 9/25/09. (CR 03-1098-001-PHX-EHC)(SAT)
June 15, 2009 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - adopting the Report and Recommendation 12 of the Magistrate Judge filed May 8, 2009. FURTHER ORDERED denying Movant's Motion 10 to be Released from Federal Prison Pending Final Disposition. Signed by Judge Earl H Carroll on 6/12/09. (KMG, )
May 8, 2009 12 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that Movant's Motion for Medical Release on Bond 10 be denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 5/8/09. (TLJ)
April 30, 2009 9 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 1 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255) : Recommending that that Movant's Motion be DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 4/30/09. (KMG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilcher v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jeanette B Wilcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Represented By: John Robert Lopez, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?