American Traffic Solutions, Inc. v. Redflex Traffic Systems, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: American Traffic Solutions, Inc.
Defendant: Redflex Traffic Systems, Inc., Karen Finley and Aaron M Rosenberg, Ph.D.
Case Number: 2:2008cv02051
Filed: November 5, 2008
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Other Statutory Actions Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: Frederick J Martone
Nature of Suit: Both
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 15:1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 28, 2011 354 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying defendant's 346 amended motion for attorneys' fees and non-taxable costs. It if further ordered granting in part and denyihng in part the parties' motions for review of the taxation of costs (docs. 347 & 348 ). The clerk shall tax costs to defendant in the amended amount of $90,253.46. Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 02/28/11. (ESL)
April 22, 2010 253 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS ORDERED DENYING dft's 202 Motion for Leave to File demonstrative aids and supplemental exhibits. The clerk shall not file the lodged exhibits (docs. 218, 238, & 241). FURTHER ORDERED DENYING IN PART and GRANTING IN PART dft' s 108 Motion for Summary Judgment. It is denied on pla's Lanham Act claim in connection with dft's proposals to the state of Arizona through the Arizona Department of Public Safety; Tempe, AZ; Lafayette, LA; Sulphur, LA; Hamilton, OH; Cl arksville, TN; Oak Ridge, TN; Bremerton, WA; Lakewood, WA; SeaTac, WA; and Tacoma, WA. It is denied on pla's tortious interference and unjust enrichment claims in connection with the same eleven governmental entities. It is granted in connection with the other alleged statements and entities. Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 4/22/10. (SAT)
February 8, 2010 200 Opinion or Order of the Court PROTECTIVE ORDER this Protective Order shall govern the handling of documents, testimony and other information produced in the above-captioned Action by any party, or its affiliates or advisors. This Order does not authorize the filing of any document under seal. Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 02/08/10. (NOTE: See attached pdf for complete details) (ESL)
August 27, 2009 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING IN PART AND GRANTING IN PART dfts' motion 28 for partial judgment on the pleadings. Judgment on the pleadings is granted as to a Lanham Act claim based on Karen Finley's August 15, 2008 statement to the Scottsdale Tribune that "using uncertified radar units was an 'honest mistake.'" All other claims remain. FURTHER ORDERED DENYING dfts' motion 36 to strike as moot. Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 8/26/09.(KMG, )
March 20, 2009 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Pla's 18 Motion to disqualify; denying Dfts' 23 request for oral argument; denying Dfts' 24 Motion to strike. Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 03/19/09.(ESL, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: American Traffic Solutions, Inc. v. Redflex Traffic Systems, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Traffic Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Michael D Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Redflex Traffic Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen Finley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aaron M Rosenberg, Ph.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?