Propst et al v. Simon et al

Plaintiff: Thomas L Propst
Defendant: David Michael Simon
Case Number: 2:2008cv02111
Filed: November 14, 2008
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Contract: Other Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: David G Campbell
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 22, 2010 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE for Plaintiffs' failure to prosecute and to respond to Court orders. The Clerk shall enter judgment accordingly. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 6/22/10. (DMT)
May 28, 2010 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Plaintiffs must file a response to Defendants' 46 Motion for Summary Judgment, no later than 06/11/10; that Defendants may file a reply within 15 days after service of Plaintiffs' response; that the Motion for Summary Judgment will be deemed ready for decision without oral argument on the day following the date set for filing a reply unless otherwise ordered by the Court. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 05/28/10. (ESL)
February 9, 2009 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 7 Motion to Remand to State Court. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 2/9/2009.(NVO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Propst et al v. Simon et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Michael Simon
Represented By: Paul Allen Conant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas L Propst
Represented By: Christopher David Lonn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?