Gossett v. Fernandez et al

Plaintiff: David L. Gossett
Defendant: Barry Fernandez, Jane Doe Fernandez, H. Bollweg, Jane Doe Bollweg, M. Daters and Jane Doe Daters
Case Number: 2:2008cv02120
Filed: November 17, 2008
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Prisoner - Prison Condition Office
County: Pinal
Presiding Judge: David G Campbell
Referring Judge: Edward C Voss (PS)
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 13, 2012 166 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER The reference to the Magistrate Judge is withdrawn as to Defendants' 130 Motion for Summary Judgment and Plaintiff's 160 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Defendants' Motion to Supplement their Statement of Fa cts and Motion for Leave to File a Sur-Reply. Robert Stewart, Alex Davenport, and all John and Jane Does are dismissed as Defendants. Plaintiff's 160 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Defendants' Motion to Supplement their Statement of Facts and Motion for Leave to File a Sur-Reply is denied. Defendants' 130 Motion for Summary Judgment is granted. The Clerk shall enter judgment accordingly and terminate the action. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 03/13/12. (ESL)
December 15, 2009 60 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: Gossett's 52 Motion for Reconsideration is denied. Gossett is granted leave to file a second amended complaint, in compliance with this order, no later than 1/8/2010. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 12/14/09. (SAT)
October 20, 2009 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying pla's 42 OBJECTION re 40 Order on Motion to Amend Complaint. The findings of the magistrate judge are affirmed. (See document for full details). Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 10/19/2009. (LAD)
January 21, 2009 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 6 Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 1/20/09.(LSP)
December 8, 2008 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting pla's 1 Motion for Leave to File a Complaint on other than the court-approved form and pla's lodged complaint must be filed. Pla's failure to train claims and dfts Stewart, Davenport and John and Jane Does I-X and thei r spouses are dismissed without prejudice. The Clerk must send pla a service packet for dfts Fernandez, Bollweg and Daters. This matter is referred to Magistrate Judge Edward C. Voss pursuant to Rules 72.1 and 72.2 of the Local Rules of Civil Procedure for further proceedings. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 12/8/2008.(LAD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gossett v. Fernandez et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David L. Gossett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barry Fernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe Fernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H. Bollweg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe Bollweg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Daters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe Daters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?