Rodriguez v. Maricopa County Sheriff's Office et al

Plaintiff: Jorge Carlos Rodriguez
Defendant: Maricopa County Sheriff's Office, Campbell and Correctional Health Services
Case Number: 2:2008cv02153
Filed: November 20, 2008
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Prisoner - Prison Condition Office
County: Maricopa
Referring Judge: Jay R Irwin (PS)
Presiding Judge: Mary H Murguia
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 4, 2009 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the Amended Complaint 8 is dismissed for failure to state a claim pursuant to 28 USC section 1915A(b)(1) and the Clerk of Court must enter judgment accordingly. The Clerk must make an entry on the docket stating that the dismissal for failure to state a claim counts as a "strike" under 28 USC section 1915(g). Pla's 1/23/09 motion for temporary restraining order 9 is denied as moot. Signed by Judge Mary H Murguia on 3/2/2009. (LAD)
January 21, 2009 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice 7 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Judge Mary H Murguia on 1/15/09.(DMT, )
December 12, 2008 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Pla must pay the $350.00 filing fee. The Complaint 1 is dismissed for failure to state a claim. Pla has 30 days to file a first amended complaint in compliance with this Order. If Pla fails to file an amended complaint within 30 days, the Clerk must enter a judgment of dismissal of this action with prejudice that states that the dismissal counts as a strike under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(g). The Clerk must mail Pla a court-approved form for filing a civil rights complaint by a prisoner. Signed by Judge Mary H Murguia on 12/10/08.(DNH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rodriguez v. Maricopa County Sheriff's Office et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jorge Carlos Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maricopa County Sheriff's Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correctional Health Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?