Ogden v. CDI Corporation
Plaintiff: Martin Ogden
Defendant: CDI Corporation
Case Number: 2:2008cv02180
Filed: November 26, 2008
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Office: Labor: Fair Standards Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: David G Campbell
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 176 ORDER denying 175 Motion for Reconsideration. Plaintiff shall file no further motions in this case.. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 4/8/2013.(TCA)
March 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 174 ORDER granting in part Defendant's 169 Motion for Attorneys' Fees; Defendant is awarded $25,000 in attorneys' fees against Plaintiff. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 3/20/13.(REW)
December 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 170 ORDER denying 168 Mr. Ogden's Motion to Exceed Page Limits. The Clerk is directed to accept no further filings in this case. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 12/21/12.(TLJ)
March 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 162 ORDER denying Plaintiff's 161 Motion for Relief from Final Judgment. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 3/8/12.(REW)
October 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 159 ORDER denying Plaintiff's 156 Motion for Relief from Judgment. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 10/4/11.(REW)
April 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ORDER denying 143 Plaintiff's Motion for relief from order. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 4/22/11.(LSP)
July 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 60 Defendant's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. The Court will set a final pretrial conference by separate order. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 6/30/10.(LSP)
December 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER denying Defendant's 32 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 12/1/09.(REW, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ogden v. CDI Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martin Ogden
Represented By: Thomas Timothy Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CDI Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?