Bank of the West, Inc. v. Organic Grain & Milling, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Bank of the West, Inc.
Defendant: Organic Grain & Milling, Inc., Black and White Corporations I-X, John Does I-X and Jane Does I-X
Case Number: 2:2008cv02220
Filed: December 5, 2008
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Contract: Other Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Frederick J Martone
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 7, 2010 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 42 Plaintiff's Motion for Attorney Fees. Fees are allowed in the amount of $35,000. Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 5/6/10.(LSP)
April 30, 2010 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER vacating judgments (docs. 41 and 48 ). The Clerk shall enter final judgment in favor of plaintiff and against defendant in the amount of $171,324.07, plus interest at the rate of 10% per annum from July 17, 2008 until paid. Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 04/30/10. (ESL)
March 17, 2010 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting the Bank's 30 Motion for Summary Judgment on Count 1 of the Complaint and granting the Bank's Motion to Dismiss all of Organic Grain's Counterclaims. Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 3/17/10.(REW)
December 2, 2009 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 22 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Case. Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 12/1/09.(LSP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bank of the West, Inc. v. Organic Grain & Milling, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bank of the West, Inc.
Represented By: John Michael Sticht
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Organic Grain & Milling, Inc.
Represented By: Gregory A Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Black and White Corporations I-X
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does I-X
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Does I-X
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?