Best Western International, Inc. v. AV Inn Associates 1, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Best Western International, Inc.
Defendant: AV Inn Associates 1, LLC and Hooshang Harooni
Case Number: 2:2008cv02274
Filed: December 12, 2008
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Contract: Other Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: David G Campbell
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 3, 2012 118 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER granting 117 Plaintiff's Motion for Clarification.. Plaintiff's motion for award of attorneys' fees and costs 112 is granted. Plaintiff is awarded $183,865.77 in attorneys' fees and $24,925.94 in nontaxable costs and expenses against Defendants Harooni and AV Inn Associates, LLC. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 5/3/12.(DMT) *Modified to add linkage on 5/3/2012 (DMT).
April 13, 2012 116 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 112 Plaintiff's Motion for Attorney Fees. Plaintiff is awarded $160,902.99 in attorneys' fees and $25,219.72 in non-taxable costs and expenses against Defendants Harooni and AV Inn Associates, LLC. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 4/13/12.(LSP)
July 16, 2010 92 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot 90 Motion for clarification of defendant's motion for reconsideration. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 7/16/10.(DMT)
July 14, 2010 91 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 85 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 7/14/10.(DMT)
June 24, 2010 84 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 57 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 61 Motion for Summary Judgment; finding as moot 81 Motion for Leave to File. Plaintiff shall lodge a proposed form of judgment within 20 days of this order. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 6/24/2010.(NVO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Best Western International, Inc. v. AV Inn Associates 1, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Best Western International, Inc.
Represented By: Arthur W Pederson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AV Inn Associates 1, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hooshang Harooni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?