Jernigan v. Richard et al

Plaintiff: Rachel Alaffa Jernigan
Defendant: Kyle Richard, D Landgraf, Randy McLaws, Pamela Brock and City of Gilbert
Case Number: 2:2008cv02332
Filed: December 23, 2008
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Civil Rights: Other Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: Lawrence O Anderson
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 11, 2012 196 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting in part, and denying in part, the Gilbert Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment. (Doc. 96 ). Granting in part, and denying in part, Defendant Kyle Richard's Motion for Summary Judgment. (Doc. 145 ). Granting in part and d enying in part the Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by Rachel Jernigan. (Doc. 152 ). The Court grants Plaintiff's request to Disregard the Town Defendant's Response. (Doc. 172 ). A copy of this Order on summary judgment is to be transm itted to the Department of Justice's Office of Professional Responsibility ("OPR"). The Court requests the OPR to determine independently whether SA Richard's testimony at (1) Ms. Jernigan's hearing on her motion for new tria l on May 12-13, 2004, (2) his declaration under penalty of perjury dated November 30, 2010 and filed in this matter at Doc. 145-2, Ex. A, specifically 12; and (3) his declaration under penalty of perjury dated January 24, 2011 and filed in this mat ter at Doc 162-2, specifically 12, comply with the ethical standards of the Department of Justice. The Court further refers to the OPR the question whether additional non-administrative action is merited against SA Richard in light of his sworn stat ements. This second question is referred to the OPR in light of the recusal by the United States Attorney for the District of Arizona from this matter and the representation of SA Richard by the United States Attorney for the Central District of Cal ifornia. Should a further referral of this question by the OPR be necessary to implement the Court's referral, nothing about this Court's referral prevents such an additional referral. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 1/11/2012. (NOTE: See PDF for full details)(KMG)
June 29, 2010 117 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Plaintiff's 90 Motion to Amend/Correct re Motion to Amend Scheduling Conference Order and for Leave to File a First Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 06/29/10.(ESL)
April 16, 2010 77 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying the Town Defendants' 60 Motion to Stay Discovery and denying Plaintiff's request for attorneys' fees incurred in responding to the Motion. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 4/15/10.(REW)
September 17, 2009 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 32 Motion for release of the minutes of the grand jury that returned the superceding indictment against her. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 9/17/09.(DMT, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jernigan v. Richard et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rachel Alaffa Jernigan
Represented By: Alan M Simpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kyle Richard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D Landgraf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randy McLaws
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pamela Brock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Gilbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?