Al-Asadi v. Phoenix, City of, et al

Plaintiff: Abdulamir Al-Asadi
Defendant: Robert Metrick, Clint Crockett, Kane Kimble and Phoenix, City of
Case Number: 2:2009cv00047
Filed: January 8, 2009
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Civil Rights: Other Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: David G Campbell
Nature of Suit: Both
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 22, 2010 137 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that Dft's Motion for Sanctions against Pla's cnsl (Doc. 133 ) is denied. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 12/22/10. (SAT)
August 27, 2010 129 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: Dfts' 107 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment is granted in part and denied in part as set forth in this order. The Court will set a final pretrial conference by separate order. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 8/27/10. (SAT)
February 24, 2010 86 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re discovery conference call. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 2/24/2010. (NVO)
February 9, 2009 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 3 Motion to Dismiss Counts/Claims. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 2/9/2009.(NVO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Al-Asadi v. Phoenix, City of, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Metrick
Represented By: Lori V Berke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clint Crockett
Represented By: Lori V Berke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kane Kimble
Represented By: Jody Campbell Corbett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phoenix, City of
Represented By: Jody Campbell Corbett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abdulamir Al-Asadi
Represented By: Joel B Robbins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?